Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Referred: Henry J Bemporad
Case #: 5:25-cv-00065
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:51 AM CST
Defendant
Cuisine Solutions Inc.
211 East 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Barry A. Chasnoff
Chasnoff Mungia Valkenaar Pepping & Stribling LLP
contact info
Jacob Litzenberger
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
Mary J. Ibarra-Myers
Chasnoff, Mungia, Valkenaar, Pepping & Stribling, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Mata, Sr.
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Bailey Elizabeth VanNatta
Guerra LLP
contact info
Francisco Guerra, IV
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Shalimar S. Wallis
Guerra LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Devon Mata
as Representative of the Estate of David Mata, Jr., deceased c/o Guerra LLP 875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Bailey Elizabeth VanNatta
Guerra LLP
contact info
Francisco Guerra, IV
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Shalimar S. Wallis
Guerra LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mathew Mata
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Bailey Elizabeth VanNatta
Guerra LLP
contact info
Francisco Guerra, IV
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Shalimar S. Wallis
Guerra LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rita Mata
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212
Represented By
Bailey Elizabeth VanNatta
Guerra LLP
contact info
Francisco Guerra, IV
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Shalimar S. Wallis
Guerra LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/26 1:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/24/2025, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/9/2026, Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2025, Discovery due by 1/23/2026, Motions due by 3/13/2026,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/26 1:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(bt)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/26 8:35 AM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cuisine Solutions Inc.. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
11 11 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/21 5:07 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/21 5:01 PM
Scheduling Recommendations PARTIES SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 03/21 4:57 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan PARTIES JOINT 26f REPORT by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 9 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/14 12:06 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Video Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/13 3:17 PM
Defendant Cuisine Solutions, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Mary J. Ibarra-Myers added to party Cuisine Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) by Cuisine Solutions Inc..(Ibarra-Myers, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/31 10:44 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Jason K. Pulliam no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 9:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 10:05 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (r013)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/23 8:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Cuisine Solutions Inc.. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/16 2:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Devon Mata, David Mata, Jr, David Mata, Sr, Rita Mata, Mathew Mata. REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS RE: DEFENDANT CUISINE SOLUTIONS INC. (Wallis, Shalimar)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19677300), filed by Rita Mata, Devon Mata, David Mata, Sr, David Mata, Jr, Mathew Mata.(Wallis, Shalimar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/23 8:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bt)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Thu 01/23 8:44 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bt)
Related: [-]