Mata, et al. v. Cuisine Solutions Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Referred: | Henry J Bemporad |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00065 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:51 AM CST |
Defendant
Cuisine Solutions Inc.
211 East 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Mata, Sr.
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devon Mata
as Representative of the Estate of David Mata, Jr., deceased c/o Guerra LLP 875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mathew Mata
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita Mata
875 E. Ashby Place Suite 1200
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/24/2025, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/9/2026, Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2025, Discovery due by 1/23/2026, Motions due by 3/13/2026,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(bt) |
|
12 | 12
![]() CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cuisine Solutions Inc.. (Ibarra-Myers, Mary) |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Scheduling Recommendations PARTIES SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan PARTIES JOINT 26f REPORT by David Mata, Sr, Devon Mata, Mathew Mata, Rita Mata. (Wallis, Shalimar) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Video Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Defendant Cuisine Solutions, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Mary J. Ibarra-Myers added to party Cuisine Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) by Cuisine Solutions Inc..(Ibarra-Myers, Mary) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Jason K. Pulliam no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl) |
|
4 | 4
![]() STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (r013) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Cuisine Solutions Inc.. (bt) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Devon Mata, David Mata, Jr, David Mata, Sr, Rita Mata, Mathew Mata. REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS RE: DEFENDANT CUISINE SOLUTIONS INC. (Wallis, Shalimar) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19677300), filed by Rita Mata, Devon Mata, David Mata, Sr, David Mata, Jr, Mathew Mata.(Wallis, Shalimar) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 01/23 8:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bt) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Thu 01/23 8:44 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bt) |