Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-10160
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
Broder Bros. Co.
Represented By
T.L. Summerville
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Andrew B. Fromm
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Defendant
S&S Activewear, LLC
Represented By
T.L. Summerville
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Andrew B. Fromm
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Defendant
S&S Holdings, LLC
Represented By
T.L. Summerville
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Andrew B. Fromm
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mylocker.com, LLC
Represented By
Melissa Benton Moore
Bodman PLC
contact info
John A. Behrendt
Bodman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/17 1:23 PM
REPLY to Response re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&S Activewear, LLC, S&S Holdings, LLC. (Summerville, T.L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/04 10:30 AM
RESPONSE to14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mylocker.com, LLC. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Friday, February 28, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/28 11:02 AM
REPLY to Response re13 MOTION to Stay filed by Broder Bros. Co.. (Summerville, T.L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/21 12:13 PM
RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Stay filed by Mylocker.com, LLC. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Tue 02/11 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by S&S Holdings, LLC, S&S Activewear, LLC. (Summerville, T.L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3
13 13 motion Stay Tue 02/11 4:09 PM
MOTION to Stay by Broder Bros. Co.. (Summerville, T.L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
12 12 notice Appearance Tue 02/11 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by T.L. Summerville on behalf of All Defendants. (Summerville, T.L.)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Tue 02/11 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Fromm on behalf of All Defendants. (Fromm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/03 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Behrendt, John) Modified on 2/3/2025 (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 order Vacating Show Cause* Fri 01/31 9:10 AM
Order Vacating4 Order to Show Cause filed by Mylocker.com, LLC. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 01/30 11:20 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mylocker.com, LLC. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Index of Exhibits
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/24 9:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. S&S Holdings, LLC served on 1/22/2025, answer due 2/12/2025. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/22 12:19 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Broder Bros. Co. served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/21 1:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. S&S Activewear, LLC served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 order Show Cause Fri 01/17 1:28 PM
ORDER for Mylocker.com, LLC to Show Cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2025 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 01/17 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (THum)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 01/17 11:23 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (THum)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 notice Appearance Thu 01/16 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Benton Moore on behalf of Mylocker.com, LLC. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 46 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 01/16 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Mylocker.com, LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10082866 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Illinois. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
misc Addition of Parties Thu 01/16 2:36 PM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Mylocker.com, LLC. (Behrendt, John)
Related: [-]