California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-00104
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 1:38 AM PST
Defendant
City of San Diego
Defendant
Officer Daniel Neifer
Defendant
Officer Garrett Edward Sheehan
Defendant
Officer Alberto Zaragoza
Plaintiff
Joseph Freeman
907 West Blvd, 1019
Los Angeles, CA 90024

GPO Apr 28 2025
ORDER (1) Granting Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, (2) Denying Motion to Seal, (3) Granting Motion for Leave to File Electronically, and (4) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed R. CIV. P. 4(c)(3), (3). US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Signed by District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/28/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (bdc)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 8:43 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically.(bdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Letter
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents Tue 04/29 7:48 AM
ORDER (1) Granting Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, (2) Denying Motion to Seal, (3) Granting Motion for Leave to File Electronically, and (4) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed R. CIV. P. 4(c)(3), (3). US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Signed by District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/28/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (bdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 motion Leave to Electronically File Documents Mon 02/24 1:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Joseph Freeman. (bdc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Seal - Seal a Previously Filed Document Mon 02/24 1:18 PM
MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Freeman. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 02/03 11:55 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3 Order of Judge Transfer. Mail sent to Joseph Freeman. (aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 01/17 1:23 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25cv0104 DMS-MSB. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/17/25.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/16 11:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Freeman. (yxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of San Diego, Daniel Neifer, Garrett Edward Sheehan, Alberto Zaragoza, IFP Filed, filed by Joseph Freeman. The new case number is 3:25-cv-104-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(yxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope