Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:25-cv-00046
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 5:21 AM EST
Defendant
Tony Black
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
April Wilhelm
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Starke County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Starke County
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Jack Rosa
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Dave Pearmen
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Rachel Oesterreich
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Pamela McDonald
Defendant
Chad McDonald
Defendant
Jack Hudgens
individually and in his official capacity as Chief Deputy of the Sheriff of Starke County 5435 E. State Road 8
Knox, IN 46534
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Mark Gourley
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
William Dulin
Represented By
Nicholas T Otis
Newby Lewis Kaminski Jones LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Byrd
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
Don Binkley
Represented By
Joseph W Smith
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Elizabeth A Knight
Clark Johnson & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Mayhew
Represented By
Peter J Agostino
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/25 8:59 AM
ORDER granting35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss28 and33 is extended to 5/22/2025, as requested. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 4/25/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/24 3:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ,29 Memorandum in Support,34 Memorandum in Support,28 MOTION to Dismiss - UNOPPOSED by Plaintiff Julie Mayhew. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
34 34 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 04/11 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald.(Wessels, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
33 33 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald. (Wessels, Max)
Related: [-]
32 32 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 10:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Don Binkley, Tony Black, Daniel Byrd, Mark Gourley, Jack Hudgens, Rachel Oesterreich, Dave Pearmen, Jack Rosa, Starke County, Starke County Sheriff's Department, April Wilhelm.(Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 10:18 AM
DOCKETED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Don Binkley, Tony Black, Daniel Byrd, Mark Gourley, Jack Hudgens, Rachel Oesterreich, Dave Pearmen, Jack Rosa, Starke County, Starke County Sheriff's Department, April Wilhelm.(Christman, Katlyn) Modified on 4/11/2025 (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 motion Hearing Wed 04/09 12:05 PM
MOTION for Hearing re28 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant William Dulin. (Otis, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
29 29 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 04/09 11:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Dulin. (Otis, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Wed 04/09 11:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant William Dulin. (Otis, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Max G Wessels on behalf of Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald (Wessels, Max)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 12:18 PM
ORDER granting25 Defendants' Joint Agreed Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint. Deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 4/11/25 for all defendants. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 3/11/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/11 12:20 PM
***Answer Deadlines extended per DE 26 . (ers)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/10 4:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Don Binkley, Tony Black, Daniel Byrd, Mark Gourley, Jack Hudgens, Rachel Oesterreich, Dave Pearmen, Jack Rosa, Starke County, Starke County Sheriff's Department, April Wilhelm. (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Kivetz on behalf of Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald (Kivetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James G Sotos on behalf of Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald (Sotos, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Otis on behalf of William Dulin (Otis, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Knight on behalf of Tony Black, Dave Pearmen, April Wilhelm, Starke County Sheriff's Department, Starke County, Don Binkley, Mark Gourley, Rachel Oesterreich, Jack Rosa, Daniel Byrd, Jack Hudgens (Knight, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 4:43 PM
ORDER: The Court AFFIRMS the extension of Dft's deadlines to file a responsive pleading until 3/11/2025, as to Starke County, Binkley, Oesterreich, Rosa, Byrd, Hudgens, Pearmen, Pamela McDonald, Wilhelm, and Starke County Sheriff's Department, and until 3/12/2025, as to Dulin and Black. The Court ADVISES the Dfts, through counsel, to use care to comply fully with applicable deadlines the Court rules going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/14/2025. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/14 2:45 PM
Set Deadlines: Defendants, Starke County, Binkley, Oesterreich, Rosa, Byrd, Hudgens, Pearmen, Pamela McDonald, Wilhelm, and Starke County Sheriffs Department answer due 03/11/2025. Defendants, Dulin and Black answer due 03/12/2025. Defendant, Chad McDonald answer due 03/13/2025. Defendant Gourley answer due 03/14/2025 per19 Agreed Notice. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
19 19 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Thu 02/13 4:36 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Chad McDonald, Tony Black, Dave Pearmen, Pamela McDonald, April Wilhelm, Starke County Sheriff's Department, Starke County, Don Binkley, Mark Gourley, Rachel Oesterreich, William Dulin, Jack Rosa, Daniel Byrd, Jack Hudgens ; answer due by 3/11/2025. (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W Smith on behalf of Tony Black, Dave Pearmen, April Wilhelm, Starke County Sheriff's Department, Starke County, Don Binkley, Mark Gourley, Rachel Oesterreich, Jack Rosa, Daniel Byrd, Jack Hudgens (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Starke County Sheriff's Department served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. April Wilhelm served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Pamela McDonald served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Dave Pearmen served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Tony Black served on 1/22/2025, answer due 2/12/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Chad McDonald served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Jack Hudgens served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Daniel Byrd served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Jack Rosa served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. William Dulin served on 1/22/2025, answer due 2/12/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Rachel Oesterreich served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Mark Gourley served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Don Binkley served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Mayhew. Starke County served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025. (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Don Binkley, Tony Black, Daniel Byrd, William Dulin, Mark Gourley, Jack Hudgens, Chad McDonald, Pamela McDonald, Rachel Oesterreich, Dave Pearmen, Jack Rosa, Starke County, Starke County Sheriff's Department, April Wilhelm. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ely)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/17 8:50 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco added. (ely)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/17 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel added. (ely)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Agostino on behalf of Julie Mayhew (Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5790652.), filed by Julie Mayhew.(Agostino, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons - Binkley,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons - Black,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Summons - Byrd,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Summons - Dulin,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Summons - Gourlin,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Summons - Hudgens,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Summons - McDonald, Chad,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Summons - McDonald, Pamela,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Summons - Oesterreich,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons Summons - Pearman,
Att: 12 Proposed Summons Summons - Rosa,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons Summons - Starke County,
Att: 14 Proposed Summons Summons - Starke County Sheriff,
Att: 15 Proposed Summons Summons - Wilhelm