Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00122
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Case in other court:22nd Judicial District Court St. Tammany Parish, 202416524
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:58 AM CST
Defendant
Joseph Mooney
Represented By
Jason M. Bigelow
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jason M. Bigelow
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Gambino
Represented By
Ralph L. Fletcher
Fletcher & Roy, LLC
contact info
Ryan James Chenevert
Fletcher, Roy & Chenevert, L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/31 3:22 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/31/2025. (meb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 03/20 10:48 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff by March 28, 2025 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff elects not to file an opposition by that date, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/19/2025.(amj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 respoth Claim Tue 02/04 12:03 PM
CLAIM other by Charles Gambino. (Fletcher, Ralph)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 02/04 9:45 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Filing attorney incorrectly selected Joseph Mooney as a filer(s). Correct filer(s) is United States of America. Clerk took corrective action. (meb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 02/03 5:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedy by United States of America, Joseph Mooney. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/19/2025.Attorney Jason M. Bigelow added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Bigelow, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Friday, January 17, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 10:19 AM
Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal filed by Joseph Mooney. (amj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 01/16 3:49 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (ess)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/16 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court St. Tammany Parish, case number 202416524 filed by Joseph Mooney.Attorney Jason M. Bigelow added to party Joseph Mooney(pty:dft).(Bigelow, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet