California Central District Court
Judge:Sheri Pym
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:25-cv-00134
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Case in other court:Riverside, CVRI2406057
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 2:11 AM PST
Defendant
Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By
Liana Allison Wong
Turner Henningsen Wolf And Vandenburg, LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Wolf
Turner Henningsen Wolf And Vandenburg, LLP
contact info
Lauren Kennedy VanDenburg
Turner Henningsen Wolf And Vandenburg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Francisco Rodriguez
Represented By
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Joshua Kohanoff
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Luis A. Serrano
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yezenia Elizabeth Sosa
Represented By
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Joshua Kohanoff
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Luis A. Serrano
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 13 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/07 10:50 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Deadline to Amend Pleading or AddParties: April 11, 2025; Last Day to Conduct Mediation: August29, 2025; Deadline for Initial Designation of ExpertWitnesses: August 29, 2025; Deadline for Designation of RebuttalExpert Witnesses: September 12, 2025; Discovery Cutoff (for both fact and expertdiscovery): September 26, 2025; Motion (Including Summary Judgment)Hearing Cutoff: October 28, 2025; Pretrial Conference: November 18, 2025,10:00 a.m.; Trial: December 1, 2025, 9:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Fri 04/04 1:31 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 08/29/2025. (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Wed 03/26 11:33 AM
(TEXT ONLY ENTRY) Minutes of Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The case was called and counsel made their appearances. The court and counsel conferred regarding the case. The court will review the parties Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and issue a scheduling order. Attorney for Plaintiff: Luis A. Serano. Attorney for Defendant: Matthew C. Wolf. Courtroom Deputy: Kimberly Carter. Time: 5 minutes THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. Court Recorder: CS-RS-146. (kca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 03/12 4:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Setting Scheduling Conference. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on March 25, 2025, at 10:00 a.m (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/05 2:55 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2025, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Thu 03/06 4:02 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 5:25-cv-00134-SP. (ap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Thu 02/27 4:43 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiffs Yezenia Elizabeth Sosa, Francisco Rodriguez. (Kohanoff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 02/27 4:38 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Yezenia Elizabeth Sosa, Francisco Rodriguez..(Kohanoff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial Dates Worksheet
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 01/27 3:59 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/21 4:49 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 01/17 10:59 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 01/17 10:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 01/17 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 01/16 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 , Notice (Other)4 served on 1/16/25. (Wolf, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/16 4:02 PM
Notice of Re-fling State Court Answer filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Wolf, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/16 3:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC identifying JLRNA is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, which is a subsidiary of TML Holdings Pte. Ltd., which is a subsidiary of Tata Motors Ltd as Corporate Parent. (Wolf, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/16 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Wolf, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/16 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2406057 Receipt No: ACACDC-38927251 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attorney Matthew C. Wolf added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Wolf, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 01/17 11:04 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Yezenia Elizabeth Sosa, Francisco Rodriguez. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/29/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 01/17 11:05 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]