Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00046
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:47 AM CST
Defendant
AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By
W. Matthew Pierce
Perkins Coie
contact info
Amanda Tessar
Perkins Coie Llp - Denver
contact info
Plaintiff
Fleet Connect Solutions LLC
Represented By
Danielle De La Paz
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Carey Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
James Francis McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 05/12 11:15 AM
FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: ( Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2026 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 8/17/2026 at 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2026 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.), Motions terminated:18 JOINT MOTION To Amend Docket Control Order filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Motion(s)18 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/11/2025. (mdj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
21 21 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 8:37 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/08/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
20 20 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 8:36 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/08/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 2:02 PM
JOINT MOTION For Entry Of A Protective Order by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 2:00 PM
JOINT MOTION To Amend Docket Control Order by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 1:57 PM
JOINT MOTION For Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/07 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis E. Lynch on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Lynch, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 6:00 PM
JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Interim Deconsolidation Schedule by AutoZone, Inc.. (Pierce, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/30 3:48 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES (Motion(s)(48 in 2:24-cv-00879-JRG-RSP), (49 in 2:24-cv-00879-JRG-RSP), (47 in 2:24-cv-00879-JRG-RSP) terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/25/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 11:27 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER- The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:24-cv-00879. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/18/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 02/06 4:29 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. AutoZone, Inc. answer is now due 3/28/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/06 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Matthew Pierce on behalf of AutoZone, Inc. (Pierce, W.)
Related: [-]
10 10 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 02/06 4:15 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by AutoZone, Inc.. Summons originally served on 01/21/2025. Agreed new answer date is 03/28/2025.(Tessar, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/06 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Tessar on behalf of AutoZone, Inc. (Tessar, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/28 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. AutoZone, Inc. served on 1/21/2025. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/20 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle De La Paz on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (De La Paz, Danielle)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/20 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/20 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 9:15 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to AutoZone, Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/17 8:53 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 01/17 9:06 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 3 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 01/16 5:44 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 01/16 5:42 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AutoZone, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10625113.), filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,429,810,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,005,053,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,862,184,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,941,223,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,961,586,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,633,616,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,463,896,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,647,270,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,450,955,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,536,189,
Att: 11 Exhibit K. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,599,715,
Att: 12 Exhibit L. Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,701,360,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 14 Additional Attachment(s) Proposed Summons