South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-07726
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 7:07 AM EST
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Co LLC
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co Inc
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Co
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp
Defendant
United Technologies Corp
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
Defendant
Amerex Corp
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corp
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
Carrier Global Corp
Defendant
Dynax Corp
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
Plaintiff
John Triller
Represented By
Michael G Stag
Stag Liuzza LLC
contact info
Merritt E Cunningham
Stag Liuzza LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 01/16 3:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 12/31/2024), John Triller v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-07726-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern District of New York, Plattsburgh Division (jbin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 3:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12182088.), filed by John Triller. Service due by 3/31/2025 (jbin)
Related: [-]