Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-20010
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 2:26 AM EST
Defendant
Alberto Prieto (1)
Represented By
Ramon De La Cabada
Law Office Of Ramon De La Cabada PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 3:16 AM EST
Monday, December 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alberto Prieto (1). (ogn1) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ramon De La Cabada appearing for Alberto Prieto (De La Cabada, Ramon) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein: Initial Appearance as to Alberto Prieto held on 12/23/2024. Bond set: Alberto Prieto (1) $5,000,000 PSB & $200,000 10% WITH NEBBIA. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 12/20/2024.. Arraignment set for 1/6/2025 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 1/6/2025 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 1/6/2025 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Status Conference Re: Nebbia Matters set for 12/27/2024 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Ramon De La Cabada for Alberto Prieto (Digital 13:51:20;14:20:57;15:23:23) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/23/2024). (at) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/27/2024) (ogn1). [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
4 4 $5,000,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Alberto Prieto Approved by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (at) (at). [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/26/2024) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 ORAL MOTION to Continue Arraignment/Preliminary/Report Re: Counsel by Alberto Prieto. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION to modify conditions of bond by Alberto Prieto. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
7 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Continue Arraignment/Preliminary/Report Re: Counsel as to Alberto Prieto (1); granting 6 Motion to modify conditions of bond as to Alberto Prieto (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/27/2024. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein: Status Conference Re: Nebbia as to Alberto Prieto held on 12/27/2024. The parties stipulated that the nebbia has been satisfied. Stipulation filed in open court. Defense ore tenus motion to contiune ARR/PRELM/RRC -Granted Defense counsel waives speedies. Defense ore tenus motion to modify conditions of bond- Granted. ( Arraignment set for 1/13/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 1/13/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 1/13/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.). (Digital 13:48:16) Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/27/2024. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
9 9 Stipulation and Order as to Alberto Prieto re: Nebbia Conditions Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 12/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
10 10 $200,000 10% PSB Bond Entered as to Alberto Prieto Receipt # 296537. Approved by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (fbn) (fbn). [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/30/2024) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ramon De La Cabada appearing for Alberto Prieto (De La Cabada, Ramon) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing or Arraignment by USA as to Alberto Prieto. Responses due by 1/24/2025. Related [+] [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-] ynolds, Anthony Ray
13 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue as to Alberto Prieto (1). Arraignment set for 1/23/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 1/23/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 1/23/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/10/2025. (fbn) [1:24-mj-04619-MFE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT as to Alberto Prieto (1) count(s) 1 and Forfeiture. (ogn1) (ogn1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/15/2025) Restricted Unredacted Indictment