Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00004
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 2:17 AM EST
Defendant
Travis O'Neil Todd (1)
Represented By
Sarah H. Olesiuk
Federal Defender Services Of Eastern Tennessee
contact info
Joseph F Della-Rodolfa
Montpelier Della-Rodolfa Attorneys
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer Kolman
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Travis O'Neil Todd: Time excluded from 3/5/2025 until 7/8/2025. Granting 16 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Motions filed by Travis O'Neil Todd. Plea Agreement due by 6/9/2025. Jury Trial reset from 3/25/2025 to 7/8/2025 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/13/2025. (JDH)

Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 2:59 AM EST
Thursday, December 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Travis O'Neil Todd.(RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Travis O'Neil Todd held on 12/19/2024. Federal Defender Sarah Olesiuk was appointed for purposes of this hearing. Counsel for defendant shall file an update regarding the financial affidavit on or before January 3, 2025. Defendant waived the right to preliminary and detention hearings. Status Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. **Please note, if an indictment is returned prior to the status conference, the hearing will likely be an Arraignment Hearing on indictment. (Court Reporter DCR)Defendant remanded to custody. (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Travis O'Neil Todd. Approved by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on December 19, 2024. (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Travis O'Neil Todd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on December 19, 2024. (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Travis O'Neil Todd (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Travis O'Neil Todd (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Travis O'Neil Todd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on December 19, 2024. (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Travis O'Neil Todd : Status Conference reset to 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. (RLK) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marcos M Garza appearing for Travis O'Neil Todd and request to preserve evidence Retained (Garza, Marcos) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Travis O'Neil Todd. (Olesiuk, Sarah) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Travis O'Neil Todd (1). The parties shall appear before the undersigned for a status conference on January 16, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on January 6, 2025. (JAN) [3:24-mj-01261-DCP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Travis O'Neil Todd : Please note that the Status Conference will now be an Arraignment set for 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. (RLK)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMENT as to Travis O'Neil Todd (1) count(s) 1, 2.(JAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
12 12 Sealed Document-Unredacted Indictment (JAN)
Related: [-]