Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00096
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:26 AM CST
Defendant
Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (1)
Represented By
Sandra S. Lewis
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (jg1)
GPO Feb 14 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (jg1)

Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 2:17 AM CST
Thursday, December 19, 2024
Arrest of Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes held on 12/20/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes, (Detention Hearing set for 12/27/2024 03:00 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda, Preliminary Hearing set for 12/27/2024 03:00 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sandra S. Lewis appearing for Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes . Attorney Sandra S. Lewis added to party Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes(pty:dft) (Lewis, Sandra) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (Lewis, Sandra) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAIN WITHOUT BOND as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:24-mj-05068-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (bot1)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ENHANCED PENALTY by USA as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes (bot1)
Related: [-]
14 14 General ORDER of Discovery as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (r013)
Related: [-]
15 15 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Marco Antonio Medina-Reyes. Arraignment set for 1/23/2025 8:30 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton, Docket Call set for 3/5/2025 2:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (bot1)
Related: [-]