Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00105
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:28 AM CST
Defendant
Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (1)
Represented By
Damian Ryan George Rasmussen
Law Offices Of Damian Rasmussen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam R. Hines
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 18 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (jg1)
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER accepting re 19 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (mv)

Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 2:20 AM CST
Thursday, December 19, 2024
Arrest of Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo held on 12/20/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (B ESPINOSA) as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (Court Reporter ERO.) (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo, ( Detention Hearing set for 12/27/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,, Preliminary Hearing set for 12/27/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mao) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam R. Hines appearing for USA. . Attorney Adam R. Hines added to party USA(pty:pla) (Hines, Adam) [3:24-mj-05077-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Efrain Gonzalez-Carrillo (bot1)
Related: [-]