Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00372
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 12:21 AM MST
Defendant
Mathew John Barr (1)
Represented By
Richard L. Cofer, II
Cofer & Connelly PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Craig Gordon Fansler
Doj-Usao
contact info
Taylor Glogiewicz
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 1:14 AM MST
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Mathew John Barr (1) count(s) 1-6, 7-8. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 12/19/2024 (cmadr, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet
2 2 Summons Issued as to Mathew John Barr. Initial Appearance set for 1/7/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 4: as to Mathew John Barr. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]