Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00268
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Michael John Pannitto
Federal Public Defender - Sherman
contact info
Sarah Ann Jacobs
Federal Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Wes Wynne
Us Attorney'S Office - Sherman
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 2:03 AM CST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
Arrest of Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez: Initial Appearance set for 11/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (1). (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
4 4 E-GOV SEALED Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis in case as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez held on 11/22/2024 from 11:24 - 11:34. Attorney Sarah Ann Jacobs appointed for Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. Dft Location: Custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Lesley Brooks; Defense - Sarah Jacobs, FPD. Interpreter - Monica Munera. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/22/2024. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/22/2024. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER of Detention as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/22/2024. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
11 11 RULE 5(f)(1) ORDER as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/22/2024. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/22/2024 in case as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00666-BD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 SEALED INDICTMENT (Merged MJ complaint case: 4:24mj666.) as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1. (baf)
Related: [-]
14 14 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Zuriel Hernandez-Gonzalez (baf)
Related: [-]