Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00628
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 1:28 AM CST
Defendant
Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Zachary Dell Bird
Doj-Usao
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 2:20 AM CST
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
Arrest of Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez (1), filed. (Kenedy) Initial Appearance set for 12/2/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (sdm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez. Ruben R Lerma appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (mwh2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Zachary Dell Bird appearing for USA, filed. (Bird, Zachary) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez added. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez (Defendant informed of rights) held on 12/2/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Defendant, through counsel, waives the Preliminary examination and Detention hearing. The Court accepts waivers. Appearances: Izaak Phillip Bruce, AUSA; Ruben Lerma Jr. for Defendant; USPO: Elizabeth Donez-Delgado; USM: Deputy Holloway. (Digital # 9:40-9:55) (ERO: Mara Gonzales) (Interpreter: C. Raber/used) Deft remanded to custody. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (asm2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
5 5 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez, filed. (jc2) [2:24-mj-00556]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (sdm2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
7 7 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez, filed. (sdm2)
Related: [-]
8 8 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Robert Daniel Navarro-Rodriguez. Arraignment set for 12/27/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (sdm2)
Related: [-]