Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-sw-00961
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 2:37 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Claire M. Horrell
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
TRACKING NUMBER 9505 5103 3016 4348 2691 56 CURRENTLY LOCATED AT DULLES PROCESSING AND DISTRIBUTION CENTER AT 44715 PRENTICE DRIVE, DULLES, VIRGINIA 20101 IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA (1)
Terminated: 12/23/2024


Docket last updated: 01/17/2025 3:19 AM EST
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for a Search Warrant as to TRACKING NUMBER 9505 5103 3016 4348 2691 56 CURRENTLY LOCATED AT DULLES PROCESSING AND DISTRIBUTION CENTER AT 44715 PRENTICE DRIVE, DULLES, VIRGINIA 20101 IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 12/18/24. (yguy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit