Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:25-cv-00291
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
CITY OF EASTON
Represented By
TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
EASTON HOSPITAL
Represented By
KEVIN H. CONRAD
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
CATHERINE BARR HEIMBACH
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Defendant
EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Defendant
NORTHAMPTON COUNTY
Represented By
GERARD J. GEIGER
Newman Williams, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER
Represented By
GERARD J. GEIGER
Newman Williams, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By
GERARD J. GEIGER
Newman Williams, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER MATTHEW SNYDER
Represented By
TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
DAVID J. MACMAIN
Macmain Leinhauser PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEX VEMAN
Represented By
MARY C. VARGAS
Stein & Vargas, LLP
contact info
ANDREW ROZYNSKI
Eisenberg & Baum LLP
contact info
Unrepresented Party
EASTON HOSPITAL
250 SOUTH 21ST STREET
EASTON, PA 18042


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
34 34 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/09 10:38 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus.Memorandum of Law, Cert. of Service.(CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Fri 05/09 1:54 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Settlement Conference, scheduled for June 16, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. is cancelled.(dc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
32 32 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 05/06 12:26 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CITY OF EASTON, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, MATTHEW SNYDER.Brief, Certificate of Service.(MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 2:11 PM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/16/2025 02:00 PM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 4/22/25. 4/22/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Fri 04/11 4:52 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAW'S CHAMBERS IMMEDIATELY TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/11 4:49 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON MONDAY, MAY 12, 2025 AT 11:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/11/25. 4/11/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 9:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALEX VEMAN. (ROZYNSKI, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/24 9:25 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.Brief, Certificate of Service.(GEIGER, GERARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief
Thursday, March 20, 2025
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 03/20 4:42 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF EASTON, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, MATTHEW SNYDER.(MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE BARR HEIMBACH on behalf of St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus with Certificate of Service(HEIMBACH, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN H. CONRAD on behalf of St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus with Certificate of Service(CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/20 1:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus. (CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/20 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus. (CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/18 3:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX VEMAN. St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus waiver sent on 3/10/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. (ROZYNSKI, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/18 2:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX VEMAN. St. Lukes Health Network, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. (ROZYNSKI, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
misc Remark Tue 03/11 8:56 AM
Document 19 mailed to UNREP. (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/10 9:28 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT EASTON HOSPITALS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC.11 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT, AS PLAINTIFF HAS FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT NORTHAMPTON COUNTYS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC.12 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT, AS PLAINTIFF HAS FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/7/25.3/10/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 7:56 AM
Summons Issued as to St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus. Forwarded To: Counsel on March 7, 2025.(dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/06 9:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF EASTON, EASTON HOSPITAL, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MATTHEW SNYDER, St. Lukes Hospital - Anderson Campus, St. Lukes Health Network, Inc., filed by ALEX VEMAN.(ROZYNSKI, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 10:14 PM
NOTICE by ALEX VEMAN re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) of Intent to File an Amended Complaint in Response to the Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 (ROZYNSKI, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/21 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATTHEW SNYDER. MATTHEW SNYDER waiver sent on 2/13/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/21 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT. EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 2/13/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/21 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF EASTON. CITY OF EASTON waiver sent on 2/13/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/21 9:33 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GEIGER, GERARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 02/13 9:32 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EASTON HOSPITAL.Memorandum of Law, and Certificate of Service.(CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of CITY OF EASTON, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, MATTHEW SNYDER with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 02/08 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD J. GEIGER on behalf of NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS with Certificate of Service(GEIGER, GERARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of CITY OF EASTON, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, MATTHEW SNYDER with jury demand, certificate of service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN H. CONRAD on behalf of EASTON HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(CONRAD, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE BARR HEIMBACH on behalf of EASTON HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(HEIMBACH, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
misc Remark Fri 01/31 11:10 AM
Copy of Order (Doc. No. 5) mailed to Unrep on 1/31/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 01/28 12:56 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANDREW ROZYNSKI, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/28/25.1/28/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (NOT MAILED TO UNREPS)..(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 7:45 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by ALEX VEMAN.Certificate of Service.(VARGAS, MARY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 01/23 10:55 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Rozynski ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18022767.) filed by ALEX VEMAN.Certificate of Service.(VARGAS, MARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF EASTON, EASTON HOSPITAL, EASTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY ROBERT EYER, NORTHAMPTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MATTHEW SNYDER. Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/17/25 (er)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/17 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18009327.), filed by ALEX VEMAN.(VARGAS, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form