Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-40625

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles R Merrill
Case #: 4:25-ap-04001
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sterett Companies, LLC
P.O. Box 22520
Owensboro, KY 42304
Represented By
Sterett Companies, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sterett Equipment Company, LLC
P.O. Box 22520
Owensboro, KY 42304
Represented By
Sterett Equipment Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sterett Heavy Hauling, LLC
P.O. Box 22520
Owensboro, KY 42304
Represented By
Sterett Heavy Hauling, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC
P.O. Box 22520
Owensboro, KY 42304
Represented By
Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Marshall
Represented By
Henrietta Meyman
Meyman Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
court Close Case -AP Fri 01/24 10:00 AM
Case Closed. (MSP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/23 1:29 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by James Marshall (Meyman, Henrietta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Thu 01/16 2:49 PM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Sterett Companies, LLC Answer Due 2/18/2025; Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC Answer Due 2/18/2025; Sterett Equipment Company, LLC Answer Due 2/18/2025; Sterett Heavy Hauling, LLC Answer Due 2/18/2025. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 3/13/2025 at 9:30 AM (Central Time)/10:30 AM (Eastern Time) at Owensboro Courthouse, U. S. Courthouse, 423 Frederica Street, Owensboro, KY 42301. (TMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 2:16 PM
Adversary case 25-04001 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)) Complaint by Henrietta Meyman on behalf of James Marshall against Sterett Companies, LLC, Sterett Equipment Company, LLC, Sterett Heavy Hauling, LLC, Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC. Fee Amount $350(Meyman, Henrietta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: state court Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Order denying Motions for Summary Judgment
Att: 3 Exhibit C: counsel emails regarding instant Bankruptcy