Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:25-cv-05041
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Cause42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:10 AM PST
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
Represented By
Brian C Kipnis
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
CareNexa LLC
Represented By
William A Kinsel
Kinsel Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
15 15 order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/19 12:19 PM
ORDER granting the Parties'14 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Action Pending Completion of Mediation . This action shall be stayed pending the completion of mediation by no later than June 30, 2025. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 05/19 11:20 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Stay of Action Pending Completion of Mediation; Order Thereon , filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Noting Date 5/19/2025, (Kipnis, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Thu 03/20 8:19 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's12 Stipulated Motion for Order Extending Time to File Response to Complaint and Administrative Record . Defendant's time to both file their response to the complaint and the administrative record in this case is extended to 5/30/2025. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 03/18 3:15 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Order Extending Time to File Response to Complaint and Administrative Record; Order Thereon , filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Noting Date 3/18/2025, (Kipnis, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Kipnis, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 9:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER: the Court has determined that this case is exempt from the deadlines issued in Order dkt. 5 and therefore are stricken. Entered at the direction of District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 01/24 1:38 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff's8 Motion to Seal. It is hereby ordered the Clerk of the Court to seal the Complaint and Exhibit A as filed at Dkt.1 . Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MDH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 motion Seal Thu 01/23 3:43 PM
MOTION to Seal and Redact Exhibit A to Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Blackfly Investments LLC. Noting Date 1/23/2025, (Kinsel, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Redacted Document Thu 01/23 2:41 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Blackfly Investments LLC(Kinsel, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 1:30 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Xavier Becerra (Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States) and (Tessa M. Gorman, US Attorney, Western District of Washington). (MDH)
Related: [-]
5 5 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Tue 01/21 12:24 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/7/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/14/2025, Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/21 11:58 AM
District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MDH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 12:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CareNexa, LLC. (Kinsel, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Fri 01/17 12:00 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint to Xavier Becerra, Merrick Garland, and Tessa Gorman by Plaintiff CareNexa, LLC(Kinsel, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Xavier Becerra, Secretary of the US Department of Health and Human Services,
Att: 2 Summons Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States,
Att: 3 Summons Tessa M. Gorman, US Attorney, Western District of Washington
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/17 11:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff CareNexa, LLC. (Kinsel, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) CareNexa, LLC Related [+] Attorney William A Kinsel added to party CareNexa, LLC(pty:pla) filed by CareNexa, LLC.(Kinsel, William)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8803161