CareNexa LLC v. Becerra
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Tiffany M Cartwright |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-05041 |
Nature of Suit | 151 Contract - Medicare Act |
Cause | 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:10 AM PST |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CareNexa LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 19, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting the Parties'14 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Action Pending Completion of Mediation . This action shall be stayed pending the completion of mediation by no later than June 30, 2025. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Stay of Action Pending Completion of Mediation; Order Thereon , filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Noting Date 5/19/2025, (Kipnis, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER granting Defendant's12 Stipulated Motion for Order Extending Time to File Response to Complaint and Administrative Record . Defendant's time to both file their response to the complaint and the administrative record in this case is extended to 5/30/2025. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Order Extending Time to File Response to Complaint and Administrative Record; Order Thereon , filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Noting Date 3/18/2025, (Kipnis, Brian) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Kipnis, Brian) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/27 9:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER: the Court has determined that this case is exempt from the deadlines issued in Order dkt. 5 and therefore are stricken. Entered at the direction of District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting plaintiff's8 Motion to Seal. It is hereby ordered the Clerk of the Court to seal the Complaint and Exhibit A as filed at Dkt.1 . Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MDH) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Seal and Redact Exhibit A to Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Blackfly Investments LLC. Noting Date 1/23/2025, (Kinsel, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() REDACTION to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Blackfly Investments LLC(Kinsel, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Xavier Becerra (Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States) and (Tessa M. Gorman, US Attorney, Western District of Washington). (MDH) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/7/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/14/2025, Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2025. (MET) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/21 11:58 AM
District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MDH) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CareNexa, LLC. (Kinsel, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint to Xavier Becerra, Merrick Garland, and Tessa Gorman by Plaintiff CareNexa, LLC(Kinsel, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff CareNexa, LLC. (Kinsel, William) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against defendant(s) CareNexa, LLC Attorney William A Kinsel added to party CareNexa, LLC(pty:pla) filed by CareNexa, LLC.(Kinsel, William) |