Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-42682

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kesha L Tanabe
Case #: 4:25-ap-04016
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 MARYLAND AVE SW
WASHINGTON, DC 20202
Plaintiff
Alise M. Evans
5780 Village Trail
Mound, MN 55364
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Butwinick
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
utility Disposition of adversary Fri 02/14 4:58 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:25-ap-4016. Disposition: Dismissed without prejudice. (LMO)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Fri 02/14 4:59 PM
Adversary case 4:25-ap-4016 closed (LMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal (Adversary) Thu 02/13 9:55 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Alise M. Evans. Proof of Service.. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
5 5 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 02/04 2:00 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Alise M. Evans. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned - Judge Tue 02/04 1:57 PM
Judge Katherine A. Constantine added to case. Involvement of Judge Kesha L Tanabe terminated. (AVP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 01/29 9:47 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Adam Hoskins. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Alise M. Evans.(Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 01/17 4:05 PM
Summons issued on UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Date Issued 1/17/2025, Answer Due 2/24/2025 (AVP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 10:43 AM
Adversary case 25-04016 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Alise M. Evans against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. No Fee. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]