Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:25-cv-00068
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
petitioner
George Edward Thompson #689108 Jr.
respondent
Adam Douglas

GPO Jan 28 2025
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
GPO Feb 28 2025
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
GPO Mar 17 2025
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 appeal Letter from CCA Regarding Appeal Mon 03/31 9:43 AM
LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal14 ; indicating that the appeal has been docketed as case number 25-1302 with certificate of appealability denied on 3/17/25. (mlc) Modified text on 3/31/2025 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/27 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re13 by petitioner George Edward Thompson #689108, Jr (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Fee - Credit Card Payment Thu 03/27 4:11 PM
APPEAL FEE PAID re14 by petitioner George Edward Thompson #689108, Jr in the amount of $605, receipt number AMIWDC-7655016 (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Tue 03/18 10:44 AM
(DISREGARD) Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability12 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 413 , Opinion (Screening)11 sent via U.S. Mail to George Thompson Jr (jjm) Modified text on 3/18/2025 (jjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 order Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 Mon 03/17 1:08 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Denying Certificate of Appealability Mon 03/17 1:06 PM
ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
11 11 15 pgs order Opinion (Screening) Mon 03/17 1:04 PM
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 11:21 AM
NOTICE re9 Waiver of Conflict of Interest by petitioner George Edward Thompson #689108, Jr (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner Fri 02/28 3:44 PM
ORDER setting deadline: deadline for Petitioner to inform the Court on waiver is set for 3/14/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
8 8 14 pgs order Opinion Fri 02/28 3:42 PM
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 respoth Response (non-motion) Fri 02/21 5:02 PM
RESPONSE TO5 Brief in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by petitioner George Edward Thompson #689108, Jr (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 misc Brief (Non-Motion) Thu 02/20 3:59 PM
BRIEF by petitioner George Edward Thompson #689108, Jr Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner Tue 01/28 5:01 PM
ORDER to show cause, setting miscellaneous deadline: pro se misc deadline set for 2/25/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 8 pgs order Opinion (Screening) Tue 01/28 4:59 PM
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) Wed 01/22 9:36 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
2 2 misc Exhibit Mon 01/20 12:27 PM
EXHIBIT by petitioner George Edward Thompson, Jr (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L
Friday, January 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 01/17 5:01 PM
PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by George Edward Thompson, Jr (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Habeas Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 01/17 5:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by petitioner George Edward Thompson, Jr in the amount of $5, receipt number BMIWDC-7592972 (Markou, Anastase)
Related: [-]