Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Camille L Velez-Rive
Case #: 3:25-cv-01032
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 5:01 AM AST
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Doe-Reyes
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Lillo-Doe
Defendant
Hospital Damas, Inc.
2213 Ponce bypass
Ponce, PR 00917
Represented By
Carlos G. Martinez-Vivas
Carlos Martinez-Vivas Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Insurance Company ABCD
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Dr. Javier Lillo
including his spouse and the Conjugal Partnership 2213 Ponce bypass
Ponce, PR 00717
Defendant
Dr. Alma Reyes-Estrada
including her spouse and the Conjugal Partnership 2213 Ponce bypass
Ponce, PR 00717
Represented By
Jose F. Caceres-Cardona
Caceres Law Offices, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Corporation Administrating the Emergency Room of Hospital Damas, Inc.
Plaintiff
Norma Ines Muntaner
on her own behalf and as a member of the Estate of Norma Iris Segarra-Hernandez P.O. Box 30027
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro
Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Zoe Muntaner
on her own behalf and as a member of the Estate of Norma Iris Segarra-Hernandez P.O. Box 92
Santa Monica, CA 90406
Represented By
Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro
Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Norma Iris Segarra-Hernandez
Represented By
Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro
Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 6:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Carlos G. Martinez-Vivas on behalf of Hospital Damas, Inc..(Martinez-Vivas, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 5:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Jose F. Caceres-Cardona on behalf of Alma Reyes-Estrada.(Caceres-Cardona, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/26 12:04 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear; granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dr. Alma Reyes-Estrada is granted until March 24, 2025, to answer the complaint or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/26/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/26 12:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/24/2025 to File Answer filed by Jose F. Caceres-Cardona on behalf of Alma Reyes-Estrada. Responses due by 3/12/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Caceres-Cardona, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/19 9:54 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for extension of time. Hospital Damas Inc. is granted until April 2, 2025, to answer the complaint or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/19/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/19 9:20 AM
MOTION for extension of time until April 2, 2025 to to plead or otherwise move in relation of the complaint filed by Carlos G. Martinez-Vivas on behalf of Hospital Damas, Inc.. Responses due by 3/5/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Vivas, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 1:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Doe-Reyes, Conjugal Partnership Lillo-Doe, Damas Hospital, Inc., Jane Doe, John Doe, Javier Lillo, Alma Reyes-Estrada. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 01/21 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number CPRDC-8956569.), filed by NORMA INES MUNTANER, ZOE MUNTANER. Service due by 4/21/2025,(Farmer-Del Toro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons