South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Referred: Thomas E Rogers, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-00317
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
Priscilla Bail Bonds
Plaintiff
Marvin Green
2000 Wayside Drive
Loris, SC 29569


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 misc Document Mailed Mon 03/31 10:16 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: Regenerated17 Judgment w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marvin Green 2000 Wayside Drive Loris, SC 29569. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 misc Document Mailed Fri 03/28 3:21 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:16 Order on Report and Recommendation and17 Judgment w/NEFs placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marvin Green 2000 Wayside Drive Loris, SC 29569. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Judgment Fri 03/28 3:20 PM
JUDGMENT is entered by the Clerk and this case is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process (lgib, )
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Fri 03/28 3:17 PM
ORDER AND OPINION after a thorough review of the Report and Recommendation and the record in this case, the Court finds no clear error on the face of the record. Thus, the Court adopts the Report (DE 13 ) and incorporates it here by reference. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint (DE 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/28/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Transfer of Case Management Fri 03/28 12:57 PM
***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 misc Document Mailed Wed 02/12 2:33 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:12 No Serve Order w/NEF,13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marvin Green, 2000 Wayside Drive, Loris, SC, 29569 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 02/12 2:32 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court dismiss the Complaint in this case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/12/2025. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order - No Service - Non Inmate Wed 02/12 2:29 PM
ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/12/2025. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 02/10 1:55 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marvin Green.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 misc Document Mailed Tue 01/28 10:50 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:5 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Page 2 of Complaint, Local 26.01 Interrogatories, Summons and USM-285, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marvin Green, 2000 Wayside Drive, Loris, SC, 29569 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/28 10:41 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per 5 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/28/2025.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
5 5 order Proper Form Order Tue 01/28 10:39 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/18/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/28/2025. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/17 4:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Marvin Green. Response to Motion due by 1/31/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/17 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Priscilla Bail Bonds, filed by Marvin Green. Service due by 4/17/2025.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope