California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:25-cv-00474
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:0981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
The Sum of 20,000.000 in Funds and Securities Tracecable Directly or Indirectly to UBS Account No XX-XX718 WB and Fidelity Investment Account No. XXXXXX7922, Including 8268.80 Shares of Vanguard In
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Joshua L. Sohn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Barbara Y Levy
Us Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 05/02 12:19 PM
APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against All Potential Claimants to Defendant Assets Except Frank White, Jr. The Sum of 20,000.000 in Funds and Securities Tracecable Directly or Indirectly to UBS Account No XX-XX718 WB and Fidelity Investment Account No. XXXXXX7922, Including 8268.80 Shares of Vanguard In filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn,
Att: 2 Declaration of Publication
12 12 misc Response Fri 05/02 11:51 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff United States of Americato Order to Show Cause,11 (Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Publication,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Ramona P. Claiborne
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/22 10:43 AM
Order to Show Cause by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause no later than 5/5/2025, why the unserved defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/07 2:29 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (eo)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 02/07 10:25 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01899-DSF (VBKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-00474-DSF (BFMx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 notice Appearance Fri 01/24 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua L. Sohn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Joshua L. Sohn added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 01/21 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/21 10:21 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/21 10:21 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/21 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
3 3 stip Settlement Fri 01/17 3:49 PM
STIPULATION for Settlement Stipulation and Request to Enter Consent Judgment of Forfeiture filed by Plaintiff United States.(Levy, Barbara)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Related Case(s) Fri 01/17 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff United States. Related Case(s): CV 17-4445 DSF (PLAx), CV 17-4446 DSF (PLAx), CV 20-5912 DSF (PLAx), CV 20-8465 DSF (PLAx), CV 20-8466 DSF (PLAx) (Levy, Barbara)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/17 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States. (Attorney Barbara Y Levy added to party United States (pty:pla))(Levy, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet