Metro Fibernet, LLC v. City of Colorado Springs
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Referred: | Maritza Dominguez Braswell |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00191 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:43 AM MST |
Defendant
City of Colorado Springs
|
|
Plaintiff
Metro Fibernet, LLC
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 1301 K Street, NW Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Tue 04/08 9:33 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) |
|
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Metro Fibernet, LLC (DeThomas, Courtney) |
|
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Mon 04/07 8:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The deadline to file a proposed scheduling order is sua sponte extended to April 21, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/7/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 03/19 11:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to the1 Complaint is extended to April 7, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/19/2025. Text Only Entry(mdblc1) |
|
15 | 15
order
Memorandum
Wed 03/19 10:08 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Motion14 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 3/19/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant City of Colorado Springs. (Lamphere, William) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/28 1:27 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Additionally, the parties are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Uniform Civil Practice Standards of both judicial officers assigned to this case which can be found[LINK:here] . By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/28/25. Text Only Entry (jdyne) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 01/28 9:36 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleading should be designated as 25-cv-191-CNS (Text Only Entry) (angar, ) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Metro Fibernet, LLC All parties do not consent.. (DeThomas, Courtney) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metro Fibernet, LLC. City of Colorado Springs waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (DeThomas, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 3/31/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/31/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/23/2025. (evaug) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Courtney DeThomas on behalf of Metro Fibernet, LLCAttorney Courtney DeThomas added to party Metro Fibernet, LLC(pty:pla) (DeThomas, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metronet Holdings, LLC for Metro Fibernet, LLC. (Scott, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Courtney DeThomas by Robert G. Scott on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scott, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert G. Scott on behalf of Metro Fibernet, LLC (Scott, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (echa, ) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (echa, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 01/21 8:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against City of Colorado Springs (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10098917)Attorney Robert G. Scott added to party Metro Fibernet, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Metro Fibernet, LLC.(Scott, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |