Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 1:25-cv-00012
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:46 AM MST
Defendant
Katharine Hammond
Represented By
Michelle M. Ramus
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
National Park Service
Represented By
Michelle M. Ramus
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Cameron Sholly
Represented By
Michelle M. Ramus
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By
Timothy M. Bechtold
Bechtold Law Firm
contact info
Rebecca Kay Smith
Public Interest Defense Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Council on Fish & Wildlife
Represented By
Timothy M. Bechtold
Bechtold Law Firm
contact info
Rebecca Kay Smith
Public Interest Defense Center
contact info

GPO May 02 2025
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the government's motion, (Doc. 10), is GRANTED in so far as it is RECOMMENDED that this case be reassigned to Chief Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/2/2025. (NOS)

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/08 9:57 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian Morris for all further proceedings. Judge Donald W. Molloy no longer assigned to case Please update case number on future filings to: CV-25-12-BLG-BMM. . Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/8/2025. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reassign Case Fri 05/02 1:09 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the government's motion, (Doc.10 ), is GRANTED in so far as it is RECOMMENDED that this case be reassigned to Chief Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/2/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/21 12:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Reassign Case to Chief Judge Brian Morris filed by Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly. (Ramus, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/07 7:32 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Reassign Case to Chief Judge Brian Morris filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Council on Fish & Wildlife. (Smith, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State v Haaland Docket
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Mon 03/24 6:35 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION to Reassign Case to Chief Judge Brian Morris filed by Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly. (Ramus, Michelle)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Reassign Case Mon 03/24 6:33 PM
MOTION to Reassign Case to Chief Judge Brian Morris . Michelle M. Ramus appearing for Defendants Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly. (Ramus, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 6:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly. (Ramus, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/13 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Romney Philpott on behalf of Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly (Philpott, Romney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order Setting - MT Thu 03/06 12:52 PM
ORDER. Case Management Plan due by 6/4/2025. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/6/2025. (NOS)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT Thu 03/06 9:00 AM
Clerk's Notice of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and objection having been made to the jurisdiction of an U.S. Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy. (SGN)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 03/06 11:33 AM
Remark: Per the Clerk's Notice of Reassignment, the case number has been changed to CV 25-12-BLG-DWM . Please include the updated case number on future filings. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 02/26 7:35 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Tue 02/25 9:56 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/11/2025. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Ramus on behalf of All Defendants (Ramus, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JLE)
Related: [-]
1 1 57 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Fri 01/17 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Katharine Hammond, National Park Service, Cameron Sholly, filed by Council on Fish & Wildlife, Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 01/17 3:32 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3405076. (PAID IN SHELL CASE) (JLE)
Related: [-]