Oregon District Court
Judge:Jolie A Russo
Case #: 3:25-cv-00098
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Case in other court:Washington County Circuit Court, 25CV01862
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:52 AM PST
Claimant
American AgCredit, ACA
4505 29th Street
Greeley, CO 80634
Creditor
American AgCredit, ACA
4505 29th Street
Greeley, CO 80634
Represented By
Oren B. Haker
Black Helterline LLP
contact info
Creditor
American AgCredit, FLCA
4505 29th Street
Greeley, CO 80634
Represented By
Oren B. Haker
Black Helterline LLP
contact info
Creditor
American AgCredit, PCA
4505 29th Street
Greeley, CO 80634
Represented By
Oren B. Haker
Black Helterline LLP
contact info
Defendant
O&S Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christopher K. Dolan
Jordan Ramis
contact info
Steven Shropshire
Jordan Ramis PC
contact info
Steven L. Shropshire
Jordan Schrader Ramis P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. Geary
Dysart Taylor Mcmonigle Brumitt & Wilcox, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tory Schwope
Represented By
Christopher K. Dolan
Jordan Ramis
contact info
Steven Shropshire
Jordan Ramis PC
contact info
Steven L. Shropshire
Jordan Schrader Ramis P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. Geary
Dysart Taylor Mcmonigle Brumitt & Wilcox, P.C.
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Rio Verde Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christopher K. Dolan
Jordan Ramis
contact info
Matthew W. Geary
Dysart Taylor Mcmonigle Brumitt & Wilcox, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rio Verde Plantas, LLC
Represented By
Jessica Zerpoli
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Craig G. Russillo
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt, P.C.
contact info
Kelsey Jamie Buechler
Buechler Law Office, LLC
contact info
Jessica Schuh
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info

GPO Mar 21 2025
Findings & Recommendation: Plantas' Motion to Appoint a Receiver 20 should be granted. Signed on 3/21/25 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: This Court has reviewed the Findings and Recommendation, ECF 40, and adopts it in full. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Receiver, ECF 20, is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to confer and propose by April 21, 2025, a draft order appointing the receiver and specifically defining the receiver's powers and authorities. Plaintiff's motion for an order granting control of the BMO Harris bank account pending appointment of the receiver, ECF 46, is DENIED as moot. Defendants' motion to unfreeze the bank account, ECF 48, is DENIED as apparently moot. The parties should notify the Court immediately if the order appointing the receiver is insufficient to ensure the Nominal Defendant makes payroll tomorrow. Signed on 4/17/2025 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
56 56 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 05/06 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance of Britta E. Warren appearing on behalf of American AgCredit, ACA, American AgCredit, FLCA, American AgCredit, PCA . Filed by on behalf of American AgCredit, ACA, American AgCredit, FLCA, American AgCredit, PCA. (Warren, Britta)
Related: [-]