Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00001
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 18, 2025 1:19 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allen Harvey Hurst
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Perez-Sanchez (1)
Terminated: 01/15/2025
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Harrelson
Harrelson Law Firm, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/18/2025 2:17 AM CST
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5c) of Perez-Sanchez (nlp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Perez-Sanchez Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 1/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter. (nlp)
Related: [-]
Interpreter in case as to Perez-Sanchez (nlp)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Perez-Sanchez. Attorney Allen H. Hurst for USA added. (nlp)
Related: [-]
Notice FROM Texas Eastern TO District of Arizona of a Rule 5, Rule 32.1, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Perez-Sanchez. Your case number is: 19-03082 001. Please access public documents via PACER. To request sealed or other restricted documents, email Ops_Department@txed.uscourts.gov. (Terminated Defendant) If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to the national list host at InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (nlp)
Related: [-]
1 1 Fed. R. Crim. P. 5, 32.1, or 40 Appearance papers (After all docketing is complete, clerk will notify charging district of EDTX proceedings using the Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer event.) as to Perez-Sanchez (1). (nlp)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Perez-Sanchez. (nlp)
Related: [-]