Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00081
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 18, 2025 1:39 AM CST
Defendant
Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1)
Represented By
Alan Aguirre-Rivera
Federal Public Defender, Txw Del Rio
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jayvee G. Rhoda
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccr)
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (ah2)

Docket last updated: 01/18/2025 2:44 AM CST
Friday, December 20, 2024
Arrest of Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro held on 12/27/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/7/2025 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Alan Aguirre-Rivera for Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (Aguirre-Rivera, Alan) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of ASSERTION OF RIGHTS by Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (Aguirre-Rivera, Alan) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (ic) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Lazaro Michel Rabeiro. (ic) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Detention Hearing as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro held on 1/7/2025 (Court Reporter FTR-Gold-MG Cienega.) (ic) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1); DENYING ORAL Motion for Bond as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-03833-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Lazaro Michel Rabeiro (bot2)
Related: [-]