California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-70042
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi (1)
Represented By
Guyton Nyseth Jinkerson
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christiaan H Highsmith
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/18/2025 12:10 AM PST
Thursday, January 16, 2025
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 1/16/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi. Attorney Guyton Nyseth Jinkerson for Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi added. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF) (lsk, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/16/2025) attachment
2 2 Sealed Document. No NEF issued. Not served by CSA.(lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi held on 1/16/2025; attorney Guyton Jinkerson. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Recording Time 11:10am-11:34am. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release PR Bond Entered as to Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/16/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi exclude time 1/16/2025-1/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/16/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by Peter Frank Molinari Giorgi (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]