California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00153
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 11:26 PM PST
Defendant
Fidencio Villa Rocha (1)
Represented By
Martin G Molina
Law Office Of Martin G Molina
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Daniel F. Casillas
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/18/2025 12:36 AM PST
Saturday, December 21, 2024
Arrest of Fidencio Villa Rocha (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fidencio Villa Rocha.(gac) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Fidencio Villa Rocha: Initial Appearance set for 12/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel F. Casillas appearing for USA. (Casillas, Daniel)Attorney Daniel F. Casillas added to party USA(pty:pla) (axc1). [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Fidencio Villa Rocha held on 12/23/2024. Appointed Attorney Martin G Molina(n/a) for Fidencio Villa Rocha. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 1/2/25 at 1:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 1/16/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 12/26/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) (CD# 12/23/2024 DEB 24-1:3:28-3:51). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carmel Abuzaid FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Fidencio Villa Rocha (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Fidencio Villa Rocha. (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Fidencio Villa Rocha: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 12/23/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Fidencio Villa Rocha. At the request of defense counsel, the Detention Hearing - RF is continued to 12/27/2024 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (dxj) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Detention Hearing as to Fidencio Villa Rocha held on 12/27/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion 6 is moot as to Fidencio Villa Rocha. Defendant stipulates to detention and is ordered detained without prejudice. Court to prepare order. Preliminary Hearing not held as to Fidencio Villa Rocha. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/16/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (CD# 12/27/2024 AHG 24: 10:01-10:04). (Plaintiff Attorney Dana Segal, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Martin Molina, CJA). (no document attached) (dxj) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Fidencio Villa Rocha. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/27/2024. (axc1) [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Casillas, Daniel) (axi). [3:24-mj-04791-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 INFORMATION as to Fidencio Villa Rocha (1) count(s) 1. (fjp)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Arraignment on Information as to Fidencio Villa Rocha (1) Count 1 held on 1/16/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 2/21/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge James E. Simmons Jr.. (CD# 1/16/2025 DEB 25: 1:36-1:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Simpson, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Martin Molina, CJA). (dxj)
Related: [-]