California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00213
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 11:30 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Honor Cell Phone WDY-LX3 2025250600016701-0004 ("Target Device 1") (1)
Terminated: 01/16/2025


Docket last updated: 01/18/2025 12:44 AM PST
Thursday, January 16, 2025
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Honor Cell Phone WDY-LX3 2025250600016701-0004 ("Target Device 1"). (gac)
Related: [-]