California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:25-cv-00355
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 1:22 AM PST
Defendant
12th Judicial Circuit of Florida
Defendant
13th Judicial Circuit of Florida
Defendant
Mayor Eric Adams
Defendant
Mary Ross Agosta
Defendant
Judge Loren AliKhan
Defendant
Archdiocese Of Los Angeles
Defendant
Archdiocese of Bahimore
Defendant
Archdiocese of Boston
Defendant
Archdiocese of Indianapolis
Defendant
Archdiocese of Los Angeles
Defendant
Archdiocese of Miami
Defendant
Archdiocese of New York
Defendant
Archdiocese of Newark
Defendant
Archdiocese of Philadelphia
Defendant
Archdiocese of San Francisco
Defendant
Archdiocese of Venice
Defendant
Army Corps of Engineers
Defendant
Baltimore City Council
Defendant
Judge Thomas Barber
Defendant
Benderson Development
Defendant
Pope Francis Jorge Mario Bergoglio
Defendant
Jeff Bezos
Defendant
BlackRock Inc.
Defendant
James Blair
Defendant
Todd Blanche
Defendant
Attorney Alvin Bragg
Defendant
State Attorney Ed Brodsky
Defendant
Broward County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
I1S Congressman Vern Buchanan
Defendant
Taylor Budowich
Defendant
Warren Buffett
Defendant
Doug Burgum
Defendant
George W. Bush
Defendant
CSX Transportation Inc.
Defendant
California Environmental Protection Agency CalEPA
Defendant
Canadian National Railway
Defendant
Judge Kimberly Carlton Bonner
Defendant
Brendan Carr
Defendant
Judge Hunter Carroll
Defendant
Central Intelligence Agency CIA
Defendant
Dick Cheney
Defendant
Steven Cheung
Defendant
Sheriff Chad Chronister
Defendant
City of Boca Raton
Defendant
City of Cape Coral
Defendant
City of Fort Myers
Defendant
City of Miami
Defendant
City of Naples
Defendant
City of Parkland
Defendant
City of West Palm Beach
Defendant
Cleveland City Council
Defendant
Hillary Clinton
Defendant
Doug Collins
Defendant
Judge James Conrad
Defendant
Council of National Defense
Defendant
Judge Madeline Cox Arleo
Defendant
Nikolas Cruz
Defendant
Dade County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Edward J. DeBartolo
Defendant
Judge Carolyn Delano
Defendant
Department of Government Efficiency DODGE
Defendant
Department of Interior
Defendant
Department of State
Defendant
Judge Paul Diamond
Defendant
US Congressman Byron Donalds
Defendant
Sean Duffy
Defendant
Environmental Protection Agency
Defendant
ExxonMobil
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Defendant
Judge Martin Fein
Defendant
Florida Department of Environmental Protection
Defendant
Florida State University
Defendant
Lady Lynn Forester de Rothschild
Defendant
Scott Freyre
Defendant
Tulsi Gabbard
Defendant
Matt Gaetz
Defendant
Bill Gates
Defendant
Judge Darrin P. Gayles
Defendant
Judge Geoffrey H. Gentile
Defendant
Emma Gonales
Defendant
Sergio Gor
Defendant
Greenberg Traurig Law
Defendant
Marjorie Taylor Greene
Defendant
Judge Don T. Hall
Defendant
Kamala Harris
Defendant
Harvard University
Defendant
Pete Hegseth
Defendant
Hillsborough County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Governor Kathy Hochul
Defendant
Sheriff Kurt Hoffman
Defendant
David Hogg
Defendant
Thomas Homan
Defendant
Thomas Howze
Defendant
Michael Huckabee
Defendant
Human Health and Services
Defendant
Sheriff Scott Israel
Defendant
AG Letitia James
Defendant
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr
Defendant
Judge Thomas Krug
Defendant
Karoline Leavitt
Defendant
Lee County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Howard Lutnick
Defendant
Manatee County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Sheriff Carmine Marceno
Defendant
Marjorie Stoneman Douglas School
Defendant
Judge Jose E. Martinez
Defendant
Bill McGinley
Defendant
Judge McHugh
Defendant
Linda McMahon
Defendant
Judge Juan Merchan
Defendant
Metropolitan Planning Council
Defendant
Miami Port Authority
Defendant
Aileen M. Middlebrooks
Defendant
Stephen Miller
Defendant
Attorney General Ashley Moody
Defendant
Governor Wes Moore
Defendant
Mosaic Fertilizer
Defendant
Judge Dana Moss
Defendant
Elon Musk
Defendant
National Security Council
Defendant
National Sheriffs Association
Defendant
Natural Resources Defense Council
Defendant
New York City Council
Defendant
New York Port Authority
Defendant
New York University
Defendant
Governor Gavin Newsom
Defendant
Ney York Department of Environmental Protection NYDEP
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Judge Liam OGrady
Defendant
Judge George A. OToole, Jr.
Defendant
Barack Obama
Defendant
Michelle Obama
Defendant
Ohio State University
Defendant
Judge Martha Pacold
Defendant
Judge Donna Marie Padar
Defendant
Lee Pallardy
Defendant
Palm Beach County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
James Parker
Defendant
Nancy Pelosi
Defendant
Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection Agency
Defendant
Pennsylvania State Police
Defendant
Pennsylvania State University
Defendant
Pfizer Pharmaceutical Industry Company
Defendant
Philadelphia City Council
Defendant
Judge Sheri Polster Chappell
Defendant
Port Everglades
Defendant
Vivek Ramaswamy
Defendant
John Ratcliffe
Defendant
Luis Rivera
Defendant
Ariana Rockefeller
Defendant
Valerie Rockefeller
Defendant
Rockefeller Capital Management
Defendant
Rockefeller Financial Services
Defendant
Rockefeller Group International, inc.
Defendant
Andrew Rosin
Defendant
James Amschel Victor Rothschild
Defendant
Nicholas David Rothschild
Defendant
Senator Marco Rubio
Defendant
Judge Maria Ruhl
Defendant
Sheila Sanghvi
Defendant
Sarasota County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant
Dean John Sauer
Defendant
Dan Scavino
Defendant
Will Scharf
Defendant
Judge Elizabeth Scherer
Defendant
Senator Rick Scott
Defendant
Seminole Tribe Hard Rock Casino
Defendant
Governor Josh Shapiro
Defendant
Christopher Shaw
Defendant
Attorney Ryan Snyder
Defendant
South Florida Regional Planning Council
Defendant
South Florida Water Management District
Defendant
Southwest Florida Regional Planning Council
Defendant
Southwest Florida Water Management District
Defendant
Elise Stefanik
Defendant
Tampa Central Command MacDill Air Force Base
Defendant
The Holy See The Vatican City State
Defendant
The Pentagon
Defendant
The Rockefeller Foundation
Defendant
The U.S. Surgeon General
Defendant
The Washington Post
Defendant
Town of Davy
Defendant
Town of Royal Beach
Defendant
Town of Royal Palm Beach
Defendant
Treasure Coast Regional Planning Council
Defendant
Baron Trump
Defendant
Donald Trump, Jr.
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Defendant
Eric Trump
Defendant
Ivanka Trump
Defendant
Lara Trump
Defendant
Melania Trump
Defendant
U.S. Congress
Defendant
US Department of Transportation
Defendant
US National Guard
Defendant
United Nations
Defendant
United States Geological Survey
Defendant
University of Miami
Defendant
JD Vance
Defendant
Judge Stephen Walker
Defendant
Michael Waltz
Defendant
Tim Waltz
Defendant
State Attorney Thomas Widen
Defendant
Susie Wiles
Defendant
Judge Charles Williams
Defendant
Judge Omar A. Williams
Defendant
Wink News
Defendant
Steven Witkoff
Defendant
Judge Mark Wolfe
Defendant
World Bank Group
Defendant
World Economic Forum
Defendant
Chris Wright
Defendant
Lee Zeldin
Defendant
Mark Zuckerberg
Defendant
David Mayer de Rothschild
Plaintiff
Joseph D Gilberti
a licensed Professional Engineer in the State of Florida LandTech Design Group Inc. 385 Donora Boulevard
Fort Myers Beach, FL 33931


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Mon 04/14 10:08 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 25-2282 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals17 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/07 10:44 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING Previous Order (Dkt. No.8 ) and DISMISSING Plaintiff's Case With Prejudice by Judge Anne Hwang: Plaintiff's allegations are patently insubstantial, and the Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction in this case. Plaintiff has also filed numerous cases throughout the country, which federal courts have routinely dismissed. Because it is absolutely clear that the deficiencies in the Complaint cannot be cured by amendment, this case is hereby DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 04/02 4:12 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Anne Hwang: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, this case was closed on 3/5/20258 . Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis15 is hereby STRICKEN. (jp)
Related: [-]
18 18 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Wed 04/02 8:50 AM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals17 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Wed 04/02 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case8 Filed On: 3/5/25; Entered On: 3/5/25; Filing fee $ 605. Billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:55 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Response13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 04/01 10:53 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti. (rolm)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Objection Tue 04/01 10:51 AM
OBJECTION to Order Dismissing Case filed by Plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti. (rolm)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Response Tue 04/01 10:50 AM
RESPONSE to Order for Cured Deficiencies filed by Plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Tue 03/11 3:28 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Response (Dkt.9 ) by Judge Anne Hwang. No action required. Case dismissed. (dto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/05 3:15 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)2 7 [JS-6] by Judge Anne Hwang, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/11 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Response9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 03/11 2:30 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti. (jp)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Response Tue 03/11 2:27 PM
RESPONSE to Order for Cured Deficiencies8 filed by Plaintiff Joseph D Gilberti. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 02/04 10:42 AM
ORDER by Judge Anne Hwang that ruling on the Request2 is POSTPONED for 30 days so that the filer may provide additional information. FURTHER ORDERED that Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the filer must do the following: (1) Refile a fully completed Request on the Court's CV-60 Form, including disclosing all sources of income and their amounts, as well as all assets and their value, and separately addressing the discrepancy above in a statement not to exceed one page; OR (2) Pay the full filing fee of $405. If the filer does not comply with these instructions withing 30 days, this case will be ISMISSED without prejudice. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 01/17 5:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 01/17 5:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 01/17 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/17 5:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - (Discovery)1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 7.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 01/17 5:49 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Joseph D. Gilberti. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 187 pgs cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 01/17 5:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants 12th Judicial Circuit of Florida, 13th Judicial Circuit of Florida, Eric Adams, Mary Ross Agosta, Loren AliKhan, Archdiocese Of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Bahimore, Archdiocese of Boston, Archdiocese of Indianapolis, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Miami, Archdiocese of New York, Archdiocese of Newark, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Archdiocese of San Francisco, Archdiocese of Venice, Army Corps of Engineers, Baltimore City Council, Thomas Barber, Benderson Development, Francis Jorge Mario Bergoglio, Jeff Bezos, BlackRock Inc., James Blair, Todd Blanche, Alvin Bragg, Ed Brodsky, Broward County Board of County Commissioners, Vern Buchanan, Taylor Budowich, Warren Buffett, Doug Burgum, George W. Bush, CSX Transportation Inc., California Environmental Protection Agency CalEPA, Canadian National Railway, Kimberly Carlton Bonner, Brendan Carr, Hunter Carroll, Central Intelligence Agency CIA, Dick Cheney, Steven Cheung, Chad Chronister, City of Boca Raton, City of Cape Coral, City of Fort Myers, City of Miami, City of Naples, City of Parkland, City of West Palm Beach, Cleveland City Council, Hillary Clinton, Doug Collins, James Conrad, Council of National Defense, Madeline Cox Arleo, Nikolas Cruz, Dade County Board of County Commissioners, Edward J. DeBartolo, Carolyn Delano, Department of Government Efficiency DODGE, Department of Interior, Department of State, Paul Diamond, Byron Donalds, Sean Duffy, Environmental Protection Agency, ExxonMobil, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Martin Fein, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Florida State University, Lady Lynn Forester de Rothschild, Scott Freyre, Tulsi Gabbard, Matt Gaetz, Bill Gates, Darrin P. Gayles, Geoffrey H. Gentile, Emma Gonales, Sergio Gor, Greenberg Traurig Law, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Don T. Hall, Kamala Harris, Harvard University, Pete Hegseth, Hillsborough County Board of County Commissioners, Kathy Hochul, Kurt Hoffman, David Hogg, Thomas Homan, Thomas Howze, Michael Huckabee, Human Health and Services, Scott Israel, Letitia James, Robert F. Kennedy, Jr, Thomas Krug, Karoline Leavitt, Lee County Board of County Commissioners, Howard Lutnick, Manatee County Board of County Commissioners, Carmine Marceno, Marjorie Stoneman Douglas School, Jose E. Martinez, Bill McGinley, McHugh, Linda McMahon, Juan Merchan, Metropolitan Planning Council, Miami Port Authority, Aileen M. Middlebrooks, Stephen Miller, Ashley Moody, Wes Moore, Mosaic Fertilizer, Dana Moss, Elon Musk, National Security Council, National Sheriffs Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, New York City Council, New York Port Authority, New York University, Gavin Newsom, Ney York Department of Environmental Protection NYDEP, Kristi Noem, Liam OGrady, George A. OToole, Jr, Barack Obama, Michelle Obama, Ohio State University, Martha Pacold, Donna Marie Padar, Lee Pallardy, Palm Beach County Board of County Commissioners, James Parker, Nancy Pelosi, Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection Agency, Pennsylvania State Police, Pennsylvania State University, Pfizer Pharmaceutical Industry Company, Philadelphia City Council, Sheri Polster Chappell, Port Everglades, Vivek Ramaswamy, John Ratcliffe, Luis Rivera, Ariana Rockefeller, Valerie Rockefeller, Rockefeller Capital Management, Rockefeller Financial Services, Rockefeller Group International, inc., Andrew Rosin, James Amschel Victor Rothschild, Nicholas David Rothschild, Marco Rubio, Maria Ruhl, Sheila Sanghvi, Sarasota County Board of County Commissioners, Dean John Sauer, Dan Scavino, Will Scharf, Elizabeth Scherer, Rick Scott, Seminole Tribe Hard Rock Casino, Josh Shapiro, Christopher Shaw, Ryan Snyder, South Florida Regional Planning Council, South Florida Water Management District, Southwest Florida Regional Planning Council, Southwest Florida Water Management District, Elise Stefanik, Tampa Central Command MacDill Air Force Base, The Holy See The Vatican City State, The Pentagon, The Rockefeller Foundation, The U.S. Surgeon General, The Washington Post, Town of Davy, Town of Royal Beach, Town of Royal Palm Beach, Treasure Coast Regional Planning Council, Baron Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Lara Trump, Melania Trump, U.S. Congress, US Department of Transportation, US National Guard, United Nations, United States Geological Survey, University of Miami, JD Vance, Stephen Walker, Michael Waltz, Tim Waltz, Thomas Widen, Susie Wiles, Charles Williams, Omar A. Williams, Wink News, Steven Witkoff, Mark Wolfe, World Bank Group, World Economic Forum, Chris Wright, Lee Zeldin, Mark Zuckerberg, David Mayer de Rothschild. Case assigned to Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Joseph D. Gilberti.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet