California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00554
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 11:14 PM PST
Defendant
Fany Reanos Moreno (1)
Represented By
Daniel P Blank
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Ullom
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2025 11:19 PM PST
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Fany Reanos Moreno (1) count(s) 1, 2. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to seal by USA (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER sealing as to Fany Reanos Moreno. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 10/22/2024. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]