North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00409
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 2:14 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ROBERT A. J. LANG
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PRIORITY MAIL BEARING MAILING LABEL WITH TRACKING NUMBER 9505 5145 1537 4289 5008 06 LOCATED AT 3701 W WENDOVER AVE, GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA 27495 (1)
Terminated: 11/12/2024


Docket last updated: 01/20/2025 2:19 AM EST
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
1 1 APPLICATION and Affidavit for Search Warrant - SEALED as to PRIORITY MAIL BEARING MAILING LABEL WITH TRACKING NUMBER 9505 5145 1537 4289 5008 06 LOCATED AT 3701 W WENDOVER AVE, GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA 27495. (so) (at).
Related: [-]
2 2 Search Warrant Issued - SEALED in case as to PRIORITY MAIL BEARING MAILING LABEL WITH TRACKING NUMBER 9505 5145 1537 4289 5008 06 LOCATED AT 3701 W WENDOVER AVE, GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA 27495. (so) (at).
Related: [-]