Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-44123

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:25-ap-01007
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC
5225 New Utrecht Ave 5th Fl
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Represented By
1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC
contact info
Defendant
PARK PLACE REALTY II INC
3813 13th Ave, 3rd Fl
Brooklyn, NY 11218
Represented By
PARK PLACE REALTY II INC
contact info
Defendant
SANFORD SOLNY
915 East 17th St. no. 307
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Represented By
SANFORD SOLNY
contact info
Defendant
YISROEL STEINBERG
3813 13th Ave, 3rd Fl
Brooklyn, NY 11218
Represented By
YISROEL STEINBERG
contact info
Defendant
YISROEL SERVICES CORP
3813 13th Ave, 3rd Fl
Brooklyn, NY 11218
Represented By
YISROEL SERVICES CORP
contact info
Defendant
GREGORY KING
137-12a 167th St
Jamaica, NY 11434
Represented By
GREGORY KING
contact info
Defendant
KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC
137-12a 167th St
Jamaica, NY 11434
Represented By
KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC
contact info
Defendant
WENDEL A STUART
132-18 Rockaway Blvd
South Ozone Park, NY 11420
Represented By
WENDEL A STUART
contact info
Defendant
SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS
132-18 Rockaway Blvd
South Ozone Park, NY 11420
Represented By
SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNDA CATON
1357 Park Place
Brooklyn, NY 11213
Represented By
Nigel E Blackman
Eastbrook Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 04/09 10:31 AM
Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against GREGORY KING Answer Due 5/9/2025; 1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC Answer Due 5/9/2025; KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC Answer Due 5/9/2025; PARK PL REALTY II INC Answer Due 5/9/2025; SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC Answer Due 5/9/2025; SANFORD SOLNY Answer Due 5/9/2025; YISROEL STEINBERG Answer Due 5/9/2025; WENDEL A STUART Answer Due 5/9/2025; YISROEL SERVICES CORP Answer Due 5/9/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (drk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 4:54 PM
Amended Complaint Corrected the company names of two Defendants to PARK PL REALTY II INC and SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC, respectively by Nigel E Blackman on behalf of LYNDA CATON against all defendants Related [+] (Blackman, Nigel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff LYNDA CATON
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 04/07 11:06 AM
Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against GREGORY KING Answer Due 5/7/2025; 1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC Answer Due 5/7/2025; KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC Answer Due 5/7/2025; PARK PLACE REALTY II INC Answer Due 5/7/2025; SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS Answer Due 5/7/2025; SANFORD SOLNY Answer Due 5/7/2025; YISROEL STEINBERG Answer Due 5/7/2025; WENDEL A STUART Answer Due 5/7/2025; YISROEL SERVICES CORP Answer Due 5/7/2025 Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (agh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Thu 04/03 1:04 PM
Letter to Court requesting Supplemental Summons Filed by Nigel E Blackman on behalf of LYNDA CATON (Blackman, Nigel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Sun 04/06 3:25 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearances: Nigel E. Blackman (Counsel to Plaintiff); Counsel to Amend Complaint as per the record and request the issuance of a supplemental summon; and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/22/2025 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, February 14, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 02/14 1:20 PM
Summons Served on YISROEL SERVICES CORP 1/24/2025 and these additional parties: 1357 PARK PLACE REALTY, LLC, YISROEL STEINBERG, GREGORY KING, SANFORD SOLNY, KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP, LLC, PARK PLACE REALTY II INC, WENDEL A. STUART,SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS. . (Blackman, Nigel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 02/10 1:08 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Nigel E Blackman on behalf of LYNDA CATON Related [+] (Blackman, Nigel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff LYNDA CATON
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 01/21 2:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against GREGORY KING Answer Due: 2/20/2025; 1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC Answer Due: 2/20/2025; KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC Answer Due: 2/20/2025; PARK PLACE REALTY II INC Answer Due: 2/20/2025; SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS Answer Due: 2/20/2025; SANFORD SOLNY Answer Due: 2/20/2025; YISROEL STEINBERG Answer Due: 2/20/2025; WENDEL A STUART Answer Due: 2/20/2025; YISROEL SERVICES CORP Answer Due: 2/20/2025 Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (drk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/20 11:49 AM
Adversary case 1 25-01007 Complaint by LYNDA CATON against 1357 PARK PLACE REALTY LLC, PARK PLACE REALTY II INC, SANFORD SOLNY, YISROEL STEINBERG, YISROEL SERVICES CORP, GREGORY KING, KINGS HOME REALTY ADVISORY GROUP LLC, WENDEL A STUART, SIGNATURES REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). (Blackman, Nigel)
Related: [-]