Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:J Nicholas Ranjan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00089
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 7:08 AM EST
Defendant
Allegheny County Board of Property Assessment, Appeals, and Review
Defendant
Bryant Wesley
Defendant
Trisha Marie Webb
Defendant
Larry J Vasko
Defendant
Gregory A Stein
Defendant
Robert J Shages
Defendant
Maureen Farrell Perkins
Defendant
Joy S Midgley
Defendant
Jenny L Kennedy
Defendant
Matthew A Jarrell
Defendant
Hampton Township School District
Defendant
Hampton Township
Defendant
Jill Hamlin
Defendant
Denise Balason
Defendant
Allegheny County
Represented By
John M. Daley, I
Allegheny County Law Department
contact info
H. William White
Dillon Mccandless King Coulter & Graham, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Bentivegna
Represented By
George R. Farneth, II
The Farneth Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Bentivegna
Represented By
George R. Farneth, II
The Farneth Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
34 34 order Order Thu 05/01 10:23 AM
ORDER approving33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs'30 amended complaint on or before 6/16/2025. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint or omnibus brief in opposition to any motions to dismiss by 7/31/2025. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/1/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/30 9:41 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by Hampton Township Answer due from All Parties by 6/15/2025. (Cromer, Michele) Modified text to add answer due date on 4/30/2025. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CharLee Rosini on behalf of Hampton Township. (Rosini, CharLee)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/18 1:09 PM
ORDER. Being mindful of that fact that Plaintiffs'30 amended complaint has been filed four days late, the Court sees no prejudice in this brief delay, and essentially grants leave to allow it. In light of Plaintiffs' amendment, Defendants'24 ,26 motions to dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/18/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/17 4:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL ACTION AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Allegheny County, Denise Balason, Jill Hamlin, Hampton Township, Hampton Township School District, Matthew A Jarrell, Jenny L Kennedy, Joy S Midgley, Maureen Farrell Perkins, Robert J Shages, Gregory A Stein, Larry J Vasko, Trisha Marie Webb, Bryant Wesley Allegheny County answer due 5/1/2025; Denise Balason answer due 5/1/2025; Jill Hamlin answer due 5/1/2025; Hampton Township School District answer due 5/1/2025; Matthew A Jarrell answer due 5/1/2025; Jenny L Kennedy answer due 5/1/2025; Joy S Midgley answer due 5/1/2025; Maureen Farrell Perkins answer due 5/1/2025; Robert J Shages answer due 5/1/2025; Gregory A Stein answer due 5/1/2025; Larry J Vasko answer due 5/1/2025; Trisha Marie Webb answer due 5/1/2025; Bryant Wesley answer due 5/1/2025, filed by Nicholas Bentivegna; Teresa Bentivegna. (Miller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent A. Tucceri on behalf of Hampton Township. (Tucceri, Vincent)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michele McPeak Cromer on behalf of Hampton Township. (Cromer, Michele)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/27 1:29 PM
ORDER re24 ,26 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an omnibus brief in response to Defendants'24 ,26 motions on or before 4/17/2025; Defendants' respective reply briefs due by 5/1/2025. No brief shall exceed 20 pages in length. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/27/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 03/24 2:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss re1 COMPLAINT, by Allegheny County, Allegheny County Board of Property Assessment, Appeals, and Review. (Daley, John) Modified text on 3/24/2025 to link to correct document. (jd)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/24 1:38 PM
BRIEF in Support re24 Motion to Dismiss, Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Denise Balason, Jill Hamlin, Hampton Township School District, Matthew A Jarrell, Jenny L Kennedy, Joy S Midgley, Maureen Farrell Perkins, Robert J Shages, Gregory A Stein, Larry J Vasko, Trisha Marie Webb, Bryant Wesley. (Vogel, John)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Dismiss Mon 03/24 1:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) re1 COMPLAINT,, by Denise Balason, Jill Hamlin, Hampton Township School District, Matthew A Jarrell, Jenny L Kennedy, Joy S Midgley, Maureen Farrell Perkins, Robert J Shages, Gregory A Stein, Larry J Vasko, Trisha Marie Webb, Bryant Wesley. (Vogel, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc QC - Document incorrectly linked Mon 03/24 3:38 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re26 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Hoffman on behalf of Denise Balason, Jill Hamlin, Hampton Township School District, Matthew A Jarrell, Jenny L Kennedy, Joy S Midgley, Maureen Farrell Perkins, Robert J Shages, Gregory A Stein, Larry J Vasko, Trisha Marie Webb, Bryant Wesley. (Hoffman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Vogel on behalf of Denise Balason, Jill Hamlin, Hampton Township School District, Matthew A Jarrell, Jenny L Kennedy, Joy S Midgley, Maureen Farrell Perkins, Robert J Shages, Gregory A Stein, Larry J Vasko, Trisha Marie Webb, Bryant Wesley. (Vogel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Daley, I on behalf of Allegheny County. (Daley, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 9:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Allegheny County waiver sent on 1/24/2025, answer due 3/25/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by H. William White on behalf of Allegheny County. (White, H.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 01/29 11:38 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 455, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge W. Scott Hardy recuses himself from the above-captioned matter. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/29/2025. (kas)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/29 1:03 PM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/28 2:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/28/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/28 4:25 PM
Judge W. Scott Hardy added. (ert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Trisha Marie Webb waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Robert J Shages waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Maureen Farrell Perkins waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Matthew A Jarrell waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Larry J Vasko waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Joy S Midgley waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Jill Hamlin waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jenny L Kennedy. Jenny L Kennedy waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Hampton Township School District waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Gregory A Stein waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Denise Balason waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/27 8:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Bentivegna. Bryant Wesley waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/22 8:43 AM
Judge Joy Flowers Conti added. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/21 9:34 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to another Judge on this Court. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/21/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 12:36 PM
Summons Issued as to HAMPTON TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT; HAMPTON TOWNSHIP; ALLEGHENY COUNTY; ALLEGHENY COUNTY BOARD OF PROPERTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS AND REVIEW; DENISE BALASON; JILL HAMLIN; MATTHEW A. JARRELL; JOY S. MIDGLEY; ROBERT J. SHAGES; GREGORY A. STEIN; LARRY J. VASKO; TRISHA MARIE WEBB; BRYANT WESLEY; JENNY L. KENNEDY; MAUREEN FARRELL PERKINS; (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Mon 01/20 1:59 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by Nicholas Bentivegna (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons,
Att: 15 Summons
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Mon 01/20 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8655850), filed by Nicholas Bentivegna. (Farneth, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/21 11:36 AM
Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (jd)
Related: [-]