Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-10762

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mitchell L Herren
Case #: 6:25-ap-05002
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nelnet, Inc.
PO Box 82505
Lincoln, NE 68501
Represented By
Nelnet, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
GLELSI/EDUC Lending Svc
2401 International Ln
Madison, WI 53704
Represented By
GLELSI/EDUC Lending Svc
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Education
400 Maryland Ave. SW
Washingon, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Miranda Lynn Nevins
6525 E Rodeo St
Bel Aire, KS 67226
Represented By
Adam M Mack
Mack & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 order Extend/Shorten Time Mon 02/24 2:38 PM
Order Granting Defendant US Department of Education's Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Make Responsive Pleading Related [+]. Signed on 2/24/2025. (wms)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 02/21 3:32 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Make Responsive Pleading Filed by Defendant United States Department of Education (Macke, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 01/22 4:38 PM
Summons Issued on Nelnet, Inc. Date Issued 1/22/2025, Answer Due 2/21/2025 . (waa)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 01/22 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on United States Department of Education Date Issued 1/22/2025, Answer Due 2/26/2025 . (waa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Request Tue 01/21 2:17 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Adam M Mack on behalf of Miranda Lynn Nevins - summons(es) requested on Nelnet, Inc. (Mack, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Request Tue 01/21 2:14 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Adam M Mack on behalf of Miranda Lynn Nevins - summons(es) requested on United States Department of Education (Mack, Adam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 01/19 4:02 PM
Adversary case 25-05002 Complaint by Adam M Mack on behalf of Miranda Lynn Nevins against Nelnet, Inc., GLELSI/EDUC Lending Svc, United States Department of Education. Receipt Number Waived, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Mack, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 B1040 Coversheet