Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colleen R Lawless
Referred: Douglas J Quivey
Case #: 3:25-cv-03017
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 3:05 AM CST
Defendant
Verna McBride
55 Reservoir Road
Staunton, IL 62088
Plaintiff
Tina Crum
307 Henry St., Suite 406
Alton, IL 62002
Represented By
Lanny H Darr
Darr Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Mon 05/12 12:11 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 4:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Verna McBride.(Herman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 2 pgs misc Receipt Thu 04/03 12:04 PM
Receipt. (Darr, Lanny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
order Order on Motion to Vacate ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/02 3:54 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/2/2025: Defendant's Unopposed Motion7 to vacate the entry of default against Defendant is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to VACATE the entry of default against Defendant Verna McBride. Defendant must answer Plaintiff's Complaint by 5/2/2025. (ED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 motion Vacate Tue 04/01 2:14 PM
MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default by Defendant Verna McBride. Responses due by 4/15/2025 (Herman, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 04/01 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David A Herman on behalf of Verna McBride (Herman, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 04/01 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Robert Trapp on behalf of Verna McBride (Trapp, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Fri 03/28 12:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for Default Judgment due by 6/25/2025 per 3/27/2025 Text Order. (BL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 03/27 4:59 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/27/2025: Plaintiff's Motion4 for entry of default against Defendant is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). The Clerk is directed to make an entry of default against Defendant Verna McBride for failing to answer the Complaint filed herein in a timely fashion as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)-(b). Plaintiff's deadline to file a Motion for Default Judgment is 90 days from the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is also ordered to email a copy of the Motion for entry of default4 and this Order to Defendant's purported insurer, State Farm Automobile Insurance Co. (BL) Modified on 3/27/2025 to correct file date. (BL)
Related: [-]
order Entry of Default Thu 03/27 5:01 PM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Verna McBride. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 motion Default Judgment Fri 03/21 9:39 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Tina Crum. Responses due by 4/4/2025(Darr, Lanny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit Attorney's Affidavit,
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 01/30 9:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Crum. Verna McBride served on 1/29/2025, answer due 2/19/2025. (Darr, Lanny)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Verna McBride. Original Summons returned to Plaintiff's counsel. (BL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Mon 01/20 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Verna McBride ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4651083.), filed by Tina Crum.(Darr, Lanny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Appearance,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons