Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William E Duffin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00091
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 3:22 AM CST
Defendant
Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc
Represented By
Sofija Anderson
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Casey M Kaiser
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Battista
Represented By
Alan C Olson
Alan C Olson & Associates Sc
contact info
Tristan N Bullington
Alan C Olson & Associates Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/10 2:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/10/2025. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/2/2025. Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 5/2/2025. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 6/27/2025. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 8/27/2025 Discovery due by 10/24/2025. Dispostive Motions due by 12/5/2025. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/10 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/10/2025 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The court sets dates pursuant to the parties' Rule 26(f) Report and will issue a Scheduling Order. (Tape #10:00-10:08) (mlm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Mon 04/07 10:21 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Parties. (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/24 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the courts conference line at 669-254-5252. When prompted, use meeting ID 160 9647 6949# and # again and then enter passcode 943682#. The parties' joint Rule 26(f) report is due by 4/7/2025. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/18 10:17 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joseph Battista. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Tue 03/18 10:03 AM
SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 5 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (mlm)
Related: [-]
utility Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 03/18 10:52 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (mlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/14 4:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Anderson, Sofija)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Kaiser on behalf of Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Casey Kaiser (Kaiser, Casey)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs misc Disclosure Statement Fri 02/21 10:52 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc. (Anderson, Sofija)
Related: [-]
6 6 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/21 10:51 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint [and Affirmative Defenses] by Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc.(Anderson, Sofija)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sofija Anderson on behalf of Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sofija Anderson (Anderson, Sofija)
Related: [-]
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Fri 02/21 11:48 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge W be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (mlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/05 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Battista. Ascension Medical Group-Southeast Wisconsin Inc served on 1/31/2025. (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 01/21 8:06 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (jcl)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Ascension Medical Group - Southeast Wisconsin Inc. (mlm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
3 3 2 pgs misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/20 5:11 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Joseph Battista (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/20 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ascension Medical Group - Southeast Wisconsin Inc by Joseph Battista. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number BWIEDC-4863901)(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 1 pgs misc Disclosure Statement Mon 01/20 3:57 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Joseph Battista. (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]