Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Declercq
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-10190
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 7:07 AM EST
Defendant
Tech Smart USA, Inc.
Defendant
Vectortek, LLC
Plaintiff
Trivel, Inc.
Represented By
Kurt A. O'Keefe
Kurt Okeefe, Attorney
contact info
Daniel M. Press
Chung & Press
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 notice Appear* Wed 04/16 2:08 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy Jr. ***PLEASE SEE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINES*** (SKra)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 04/16 9:42 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 4:40 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference via zoom reset for 6/11/2025 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Wed 04/09 1:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Ivy, Jr. : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 04/09 12:23 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT MOTION TO REFER THIS CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OR MEDIATION by Trivel, Inc. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 notice Appear* Tue 04/08 1:42 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Scheduling Conference via Zoom set for 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. Zoom link will be emailed prior to conference. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 04/04 4:57 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tech Smart USA, Inc. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 1:36 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Tech Smart USA, Inc.. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmative Defenses
11 11 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 1:33 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc Sackin appearing on behalf of Tech Smart USA, Inc. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 03/19 2:21 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Vectortek, LLC (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/19 1:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Vectortek, LLC. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmative Defenses
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Fri 03/07 10:48 AM
STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT VECTORTEK, LLC TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. Answer due by March 19, 2025. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 notice Appearance Thu 03/06 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Sackin on behalf of Vectortek, LLC. (Sackin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/19 4:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vectortek, LLC served on 2/17/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/19 4:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Tech Smart USA, Inc. served on 2/17/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued* Thu 01/23 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Tech Smart USA, Inc., Vectortek, LLC* (THum)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 01/23 10:50 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (THum)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 01/21 9:18 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kurt A. O'Keefe appearing on behalf of TRIVEL, INC. (O'Keefe, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 01/20 7:47 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TRIVEL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent 9497-1264 Qubec Inc., Other Affiliate Desjardins for TRIVEL, INC.. (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 01/20 7:41 PM
COMPLAINT filed by TRIVEL, INC. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10085560 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Press, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Distribution Agreement