Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00141
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 6:06 AM CST
Defendant
Entergy Louisiana, LLC
639 Loyola Ave. Suite 2600
New Olreans, LA 70113
Plaintiff
Marcelino Assado
Represented By
Christopher Minias
The Minias Law Firm
contact info
Karl Easton White
The Minias Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 04/30 1:58 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re8 Summons Returned Executed. **1) **Filing attorney entered incorrect party for party that was served the summons; party served is Entergy Louisiana, LLC on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. No further action is necessary. **2) Summons filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All documents filed in this court must be in 8-1/2 by 11 inch format'.**(mmv)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Entergy Louisiana, LLC served on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Minias, Christopher) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/30/2025) (mmv). Modified text/party served on 4/30/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines Thu 04/17 1:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Entergy Louisiana LLC with the summons and complaint in this matter and file proof of service with the Court by no later than fourteen (14) days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/17/2025. (pp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Deadlines Wed 04/16 10:32 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Marcelino Assado. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Entergy Louisiana, LLC. (mmv)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 04/15 1:22 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re3 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is SUMMONS SUBMITTED FOR ISSUANCE. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (mmv)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Summons Issued Tue 04/15 1:08 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance filed by Marcelino Assado. (Minias, Christopher) Modified text/event on 4/15/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 01/22 8:15 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (adb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
1 1 58 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/20 6:19 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Entergy Louisiana, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10852956) filed by Marcelino Assado.Attorney Christopher Minias added to party Marcelino Assado(pty:pla).(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- EEOC Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Summons Waiver of Service