Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-10192
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:17 AM EST
Defendant
Mert Aksu
4001 W. McNichols
Detroit, MI 48221
Represented By
Blake Christian Padget
Butzel Long, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Carey A. DeWitt
Butzel
contact info
Defendant
Juliette Daniels
4001 W. McNichols
Detroit, MI 48221
Represented By
Blake Christian Padget
Butzel Long, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Carey A. DeWitt
Butzel
contact info
Defendant
John Ryder
4001 McNichols
Detroit, MI 48221
Represented By
Blake Christian Padget
Butzel Long, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Carey A. DeWitt
Butzel
contact info
Defendant
University of Detroit Mercy
4001 W. McNichols
Detroit, MI 48221
Represented By
Blake Christian Padget
Butzel Long, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Carey A. DeWitt
Butzel
contact info
Plaintiff
Yarnise Hines
Represented By
Christopher Lee Sinclair
Sinclair Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 11:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/5/2025 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/16/2026 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2026 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 6/9/2026 09:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. Related [+] (LSau)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 order Reassignment/Disqualification Mon 03/31 9:53 AM
ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor to District Judge Denise Page Hood in Detroit. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 01/21 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Yarnise Hines against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10085732 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Sinclair, Christopher)
Related: [-]