Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:25-cv-00076
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:Ionia County Circuit Court, 24-S-36684-NO
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:52 AM EST
defendant
Menards, LLC
Represented By
TaraLynn T. Velting
Garan Lucow Miller Pc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Ned Harmala
Represented By
David J. Elkin
The Sam Bernstein Law Firm (farmington Hills)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 misc Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand Tue 02/18 12:05 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Ionia County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Re Order of Remand Thu 02/06 8:34 AM
LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Ionia County Circuit Court (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Remand (no motion) Wed 02/05 4:37 PM
ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to Ionia County Circuit Court; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 01/23 4:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause by 1/30/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 01/22 10:46 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 11:04 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Menards, LLC (Velting, TaraLynn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ionia county Circuit case number 24-S-36684-NO filed by Menards, LLC (Velting, TaraLynn)
Related: [-]
misc Receipt Tue 01/21 10:52 AM
RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number AMIWDC-7593620; for filing fee paid by attorney TaraLynn Velting (klb)
Related: [-]