Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-bk-10311
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Rocky Mountain Imports, LLC
1501 Bent Tree Trails Ct
Fenton, MO 63026-2349
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
105 105 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 103 Order Approving Retainer
104 104 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 102 Order on Application to Employ
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
103 103 order Approving Retainer Wed 05/07 10:50 AM
Order Granting Motion By Debtor To Approve A Retainer To Its Accountant. Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 79 Motion to Approve Retainer
102 102 order Employ Wed 05/07 10:45 AM
Order Approving Application By Debtor To Approve Employment Of Accountant. Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 78 Application to Employ
Monday, May 05, 2025
101 101 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Mon 05/05 3:18 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Rocky Mountain Imports, LLC Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 79 Motion to Approve Retainer
Sunday, May 04, 2025
100 100 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 95 Order on Application to Employ
Friday, May 02, 2025
99 99 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 93 Order Approving Retainer
98 98 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 92 Order on Motion to Reschedule Hearing
97 97 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 91 Generic Order
96 96 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 2:56 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Rocky Mountain Imports, LLC Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 83 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan,91 Generic Order
95 95 order Employ Fri 05/02 11:26 AM
Order Approving In Part Application By Debtor To Employ Bookkeeper Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 65 Application to Employ