Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-00255

District Of Columbia Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Elizabeth L Gunn
Case #: 1:25-ap-10002
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Celeste Rita Riley, MD
5514 Mac Arthur Blvd, NW
Washington, DC 20016
Represented By
Gertrude Ngamga Kamtchoum
Ngamga-K Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Riley Medical Services, LLC
5514 McArthur Blvd NW
Washington, DC 20016
Represented By
Riley Medical Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
531 South Spring Street
Burlington, NC 27215
Represented By
Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
contact info
Plaintiff
Katharina Ferl
Represented By
Katharina Ferl
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Nicholas Hayes
Represented By
Paul Nicholas Hayes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/13 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion For Remand
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 order Remand Mon 03/10 2:16 PM
Order Remanding Case to the Superior Court of the District of Columbia. Related [+] Entered on 3/10/2025. Transfer of Remand due 3/24/2025. (Bleskoski, Megan)
Related: [-] :11
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 motion Remand Mon 02/24 7:22 PM
Motion for Remand Notice Non Opposition Filed by Celeste Rita Riley MD, Riley Medical Services, LLC (Aliberti, Joseph)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Returned Mail Mon 02/24 4:33 PM
Notice of Returned Mail Undeliverable as to Laboratory Corporation of America, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Joseph M. Aliberti Law Offices Joseph M. Aliberti. Related [+] (Alde, Claude)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing Continued (BK)
Sunday, February 23, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK) Mon 02/24 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing Continued (BK)
Friday, February 21, 2025
14 14 court Hearing - Continued (BK) Fri 02/21 3:40 PM
Notice - Scheduling Conference Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact Gunn_Hearings@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing Scheduled (BK)
Sunday, February 16, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK) Mon 02/17 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Hearing Scheduled (BK)
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 court Hearing - Scheduled (BK) Fri 02/14 3:06 PM
Hearing Scheduled (BK) Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact Gunn_Hearings@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code for11 , . (Bleskoski, Megan)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand
11 11 motion Remand Fri 02/14 1:37 PM
Motion for Remand and Abstention Filed by Katharina Ferl, Paul Nicholas Hayes (Kus, Colby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/06 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 02/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing Scheduled (BK)
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 court Returned Mail Tue 02/04 1:59 PM
Notice of Returned Mail as Undeliverable to Laboratory Corporation of America INCOMPLETE ADDRESS, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings INCOMPLETE ADDRESS, and Joseph M. Aliberti Law Offices Joseph M. Aliberti INCOMPLETE ADDRESS. Related [+] (Bleskoski, Megan)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing Scheduled (BK)
Friday, January 31, 2025
8 8 court Document Fri 01/31 2:37 PM
Documents from D.C. Superior Court Civil Action Number 2023-CAB-004740. (Alde, Claude)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Hearing - Scheduled (BK) Fri 01/31 11:43 AM
Notice of Status Hearing. Status Hearing scheduled for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 and Zoom; Contact Gunn_Hearings@dcb.uscourts.gov for meeting code. (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 notice Appearance (Add Party to Matrix) Wed 01/29 7:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request to Add Party to Mailing Matrix Filed by Celeste Rita Riley MD. (Aliberti, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Response Wed 01/29 3:05 PM
Response RULE 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT UPON REMOVAL Filed by Laboratory Corporation of America, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings Related [+] (Gallagher, Stephen)
Related: [-] Related Document(s) #:3 Notice.
Sunday, January 26, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/27 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 notice Notice - Generic Fri 01/24 12:32 PM
Notice Filed by Katharina Ferl. (Kus, Colby)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Deficiency Letter - Case Opening Fri 01/24 9:26 AM
Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case. Related [+] Deficient document due 1/27/2025. (Bleskoski, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Thursday, January 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 11:25 AM
Adversary case 25-10002 Notice of Removal Filed by Celeste Rita Riley MD. Fee Amount $350 (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Mathewes, Aimee)
Related: [-]