Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:25-cv-10142
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Case in other court:Dedham District Court, 2454CV00669
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:22 AM EST
Defendant
Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc.
30 Winter Street
Boston, MA 02108
Represented By
David Q. Gacioch
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Megan Corrigan
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald L. Brown
95 University Ave #2128
Westwood, MA 02090


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 02/03 9:43 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc..(Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Megan Corrigan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/03 9:38 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc..(Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/29 8:31 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 2/3/2025 to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Complaint. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/28 4:26 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/3/2025 to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Complaint by Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc..(Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 01/22 11:13 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (LBO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 01/21 3:32 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (JAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Q. Gacioch on behalf of Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc. (Gacioch, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Corrigan on behalf of Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc. (Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 2:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc.. (Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commonwealth Care Alliance, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10797175 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Corrigan, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Category Form