Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:25-cv-10144
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:22 AM EST
Defendant
FirstService Residential
3000 Davenport Ave #201
Canton, MA 02021
Represented By
Joseph E. Phelan
Phelan Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiaoyue Shi
42 Glen Street
Dover, MA 02030
Plaintiff
Zhao Wang
42 Glen Street
Dover, MA 02030


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Tue 04/22 3:18 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule the Motion Hearing previously set for 4/28/2025 is reset for 5/21/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (KB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 misc Copy Mailed Mon 02/24 9:41 AM
Copies re 9 Notice of Hearing on Motion mailed to Zhao Wang and Xiaoyue Sui on 2/24/2025. (KB)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Mon 02/24 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (KB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 02/21 6:40 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FirstService Residential. Counsel Phelan Attached the Memorandum of Law to the Motion to Dismiss in Violation of Court Rules. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/21 6:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed FirstService Residential served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (MAP)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 02/20 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FirstService Residential.(Phelan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Phelan on behalf of FirstService Residential (Phelan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 misc Filing Fee/Payment Received Tue 01/21 2:22 PM
Filing fee/payment: $ 405.00, receipt number 100010380 for1 Complaint (NVB) Modified on 1/21/2025 (NVB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 2:17 PM
Summons Issued as to FirstService Residential. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (LBO)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 01/21 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (NMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against FirstService Residential, filed by Zhao Wang.(LBO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form